Riverbed Technology, Inc. v. Silver Peak Systems, Inc.

Plaintiff: Riverbed Technology, Inc.
Defendant: Silver Peak Systems, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2013cv02980
Filed: June 28, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Scott Corley
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 8, 2013 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 24 STIPULATION selecting Private ADR. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 11/8/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2013)
July 29, 2014 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER PARTIALLY LIFTING STAY. Case Management Statement due by 8/8/2014. Case Management Conference set for 8/15/2014 11:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 7/29/14. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2014)
August 1, 2014 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 48 STIPULATION TO CHANGE THE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE DATE. Case Management Statement due by 8/22/2014. Case Management Conference set for 8/29/2014 11:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 8/1/14. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2014)
November 10, 2014 61 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 60 Stipulation to Extend Date of Service of Rule 3-1 Disclosures and Exchange of Preliminary Claim Constructions and Extrinsic Evidence Pursuant to Patent Local Rule 4-2. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on November 10, 2014. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2014)
December 30, 2014 70 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 69 STIPULATION Regarding Claim Construction Deadlines and Motion to Construe More Than Ten Terms; Request for Status Conference. Joint Case Management Statement due by 1/30/2015. Case Management Conference set for 2/6/2015 11:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 12/30/14. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/30/2014)
January 6, 2015 72 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 71 STIPULATION to Change Date of Status Conference. Case Management Statement due by 2/13/2015. Case Management Conference set for 2/20/2015 11:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 1/6/15. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2015)
April 1, 2015 83 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING HEARING. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 4/1/15. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Riverbed Technology, Inc. v. Silver Peak Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Riverbed Technology, Inc.
Represented By: Anthony I. Fenwick
Represented By: Shiwoong Kim
Represented By: Matthew B. Lehr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Silver Peak Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Bryan A. Kohm
Represented By: William Alexander Moseley, Jr.
Represented By: Michael John Sacksteder
Represented By: Erin Anne Simon
Represented By: Lauren Estelle Whittemore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.