MacDonald v. Ford Motor Company

Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Plaintiff: Jean MacDonald
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv02988
Filed: June 28, 2013
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Scott Corley
 
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
February 4, 2014 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING MOTION HEARING re 28 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) filed by Ford Motor Company. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on February 3, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2014)
March 31, 2014 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART, DENYING IN PART DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS by Judge Jon S. Tigar, granting in part and denying in part 28 Motion to Dismiss. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2014)
April 24, 2014 46 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 45 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 27 Amended Complaint, To Extend Time For Ford To Respond To Second Amended Class Action Complaint Pursuant To L.R. 6.1(A) filed by Ford Motor Company. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on April 24, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: MacDonald v. Ford Motor Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Represented By: John Mark Thomas
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jean MacDonald
Represented By: Tarek H. Zohdy
Represented By: Cody Robert Padgett
Represented By: Jordan L. Lurie
Represented By: David Lishian Cheng
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]