Scott v. Saxon Mortgage Services, Inc.

Defendant: Saxon Mortgage Services, Inc.
Plaintiff: Vicki D. Scott
Case Number: 3:2013cv03085
Filed: July 3, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth D. Laporte
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 2, 2013 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte granting 20 Motion to Appear by Telephone (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2013)
October 10, 2013 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte granting in part 15 Motion to Dismiss (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/10/2013)
January 9, 2014 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte granting 29 Motion to Dismiss (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scott v. Saxon Mortgage Services, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Saxon Mortgage Services, Inc.
Represented By: Peter M. Watson
Represented By: Charles Christopher McKenna
Represented By: T. Robert Finlay
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vicki D. Scott
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]