Gametek LLC v. Funzio, Inc. et al

Defendant: Funzio USA, Inc., Funzio, Inc. and GREE International, Inc.
Plaintiff: Gametek LLC
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv03089
Filed: July 3, 2013
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
 
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
July 1, 2014 100 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF GAMETEK LLC'S UNOPPOSED MOTION TO CHANGE THE TIME OF HEARING ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES. Motion Hearing set for 8/28/2014 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 7/1/14. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2014)
July 11, 2014 104 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING THE DEADLINE FOR PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE (AND DEFENDANTS' REPLY) REGARDING DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 7/11/14. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2014)
September 20, 2013 58 Featured Case ORDER REGARDING E-DISCOVERY. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 9/20/13. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2013)
May 9, 2014 92 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER GRANTING STIPULATED REQUEST TO EXTEND TIME FOR FUNZIO TO FILE BILL OF COSTS AND MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 5/9/14. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Gametek LLC v. Funzio, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Funzio USA, Inc.
Represented By: Spencer Winston Ririe
Represented By: Jason C Lo
Represented By: Cassandra Lee Gaedt
Represented By: Jordan H. Bekier
Represented By: Wayne Mitchell Barsky
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Funzio, Inc.
Represented By: Spencer Winston Ririe
Represented By: Jason C Lo
Represented By: Cassandra Lee Gaedt
Represented By: Jordan H. Bekier
Represented By: Wayne Mitchell Barsky
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GREE International, Inc.
Represented By: Jordan H. Bekier
Represented By: Wayne Mitchell Barsky
Represented By: Cassandra Lee Gaedt
Represented By: Jason C Lo
Represented By: Spencer Winston Ririe
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gametek LLC
Represented By: Johnathan Yazdani
Represented By: Stephen F. Schlather
Represented By: John J Edmonds
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]