Meyer et al v. National Tenant Network, Inc.

Defendant: National Tenant Network, Inc.
Plaintiff: Phyllis Meyer and Harold Meyer
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv03187
Filed: July 10, 2013
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Bernardino
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Scott Corley
 
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
November 19, 2013 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 29 Stipulation TO EXTEND MEDIATION COMPLETION DATE filed by National Tenant Network, Inc. Mediation shall be completed by 4/21/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 11/19/2013. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2013)
January 17, 2014 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting in part and denying in part 21 Motion to Dismiss (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2014)
January 17, 2014 41 Opinion or Order of the Court SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corey on 1/17/2014. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2014)
May 13, 2014 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER FOR FURTHER BRIEFING AND RESCHEDULING HEARING ON MOTION TO DISMISS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 5/13/2014. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2014)
July 10, 2014 63 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 51 Motion to Dismiss CCRAA claim.(jsclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Meyer et al v. National Tenant Network, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Tenant Network, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phyllis Meyer
Represented By: Andrew J. Ogilvie
Represented By: Erin Amanda Novak
Represented By: James A. Francis
Represented By: Carol McLean Brewer
Represented By: David A. Searles
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harold Meyer
Represented By: David A. Searles
Represented By: Andrew J. Ogilvie
Represented By: Erin Amanda Novak
Represented By: James A. Francis
Represented By: Carol McLean Brewer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]