Toppan Photomasks, Inc. v. Park

Plaintiff: Toppan Photomasks, Inc.
Defendant: Keun Taek Park
Case Number: 3:2013cv03323
Filed: July 17, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Maxine M. Chesney
Referring Judge: Joseph C. Spero
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 4, 2014 102 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: JOINT NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT All pending court dates are taken off calendar. Further, the parties shall file a joint status report no later than November 14, 2014. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 4, 2014. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2014)
July 19, 2013 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ***Entered in error. Please disregard.***
July 19, 2013 20 Opinion or Order of the Court TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION SHOULD NOT BE ISSUED. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on July 19, 2013. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2013) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/19/2013: # 1 Certificate of Service) (tlS, COURT STAFF).
July 31, 2013 29 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND CONTINUE HEARING ON ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION SHOULD NOT BE ISSUED. The August 1, 2013 hearing is continued to August 30, 2013. Any opposition brief shall be filed by August 16, 2013. Any reply brief shall be filed by August 23, 2013. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on July 31, 2013. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2013)
August 12, 2013 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REFERRING TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE PARTIES' 35 DISCOVERY DISPUTE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on August 12, 2013. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2013)
August 19, 2013 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING DEFENDANT TO SUBMIT CHAMBERS COPY OF DOCUMENT IN COMPLIANCE WITH CIVIL LOCAL RULES AND THE COURT'S STANDING ORDERS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on August 19, 2013. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2013)
August 20, 2013 42 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE OF REFERENCE ORDER RE DISCOVERY PROCEDURES. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 8/20/13. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2013)
August 21, 2013 45 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATED PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AND ORDER. The August 30, 2013 hearing is vacated. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on August 21, 2013. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2013)
October 16, 2013 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: JOINT REQUEST FOR A SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 16, 2013. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2013)
October 21, 2013 53 Opinion or Order of the Court PRETRIAL PREPARATION ORDER. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 10/21/2013. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2013)
July 17, 2013 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Reassigning the action to Judge Maxine M. Chesney re 4 Request for Reassignment filed by Toppan Photomasks, Inc.. Signed by Richard W. Wieking for the Executive Committee on 7/18/13. (ysS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2013)
December 23, 2013 61 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REFERRING TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SANCTIONS AND MOTION TO SEAL. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on December 23, 2013. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2013)
January 21, 2014 66 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re Motion for Sanctions. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on January 21, 2014. (jcslc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2014)
March 17, 2014 77 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on March 17, 2014. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2014)
May 9, 2014 86 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED STIPULATION AND ORDER MODIFYING PRETRIAL PREPARATION ORDER. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on May 9, 2014. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2014)
May 29, 2014 88 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Joseph C. Spero granting in part and denying in part 57 Motion for Sanctions and 72 Joint Letter (jcslc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2014)
June 11, 2014 90 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 89 Letter filed by Keun Taek Park, staying 88 Order on Motion for Sanctions. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on June 11, 2014. (jcslc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2014)
June 17, 2014 92 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 89 Letter filed by Keun Taek Park and 91 Letter filed by Toppan Photomasks, Inc.; lifting stay of 88 Order on Motion for Sanctions. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on June 17, 2014. (jcslc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2014)
June 25, 2014 94 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER MODIFYING PRETRIAL PREPARATION ORDER. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on June 25, 2014. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2014)
August 15, 2014 98 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED STIPULATION AND ORDER MODIFYING PRETRIAL PREPARATION ORDER. The stipulation is approved with the exception of page 1, paragraph (b), which stipulation must be submitted for approval to Magistrate Judge Spero. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on August 15, 2014. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Toppan Photomasks, Inc. v. Park
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Toppan Photomasks, Inc.
Represented By: Danielle L. Ochs
Represented By: Becki Diana Graham
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keun Taek Park
Represented By: Marc N. Bernstein
Represented By: Will Barnett Fitton
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]