Helm v. MSR Group Inc

Defendant: MSR Group Inc
Plaintiff: Linda Helm
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv03473
Filed: July 25, 2013
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M. Cousins
 
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
February 19, 2014 25 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER re 24 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Continue Case Management Conference (CMC) filed by Linda Helm Case Management Statement due by 2/24/2014. Further Case Management Conference set for 2/27/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. An updated joint CMC Statement shall be filed by 2/24/14. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/19/14. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2014)
April 10, 2014 31 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL re 30 Stipulation filed by Linda Helm. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/10/14. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2014)
October 4, 2013 6 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO CONTINUE 4 . Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/18/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 10/3/13. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Helm v. MSR Group Inc
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MSR Group Inc
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Helm
Represented By: Joshua B. Swigart
Represented By: Matthew Michael Loker
Represented By: Seyed Abbas Kazerounian
Represented By: Todd Michael Friedman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]