Rose et al v. Rhorer et al

Defendant: Christine, Dee, Bevan Dufty, Ed De Masi, Bernard Gunther, Scott Walton, Joyce Grim, Steve Arcelona, Edwin M. Lee, Trent Rhorer, San Francisco Board of Supervisors, The San Francisco Department of Human Services, The San Francisco Department of Aging and Adult Services, The Mayor's Office of Hope and Dennis Herrera
Plaintiff: The Survivors of James Larson, Raj K. Judge, Elley Fore, III, Larry Richards and Donald Rose
Case Number: 3:2013cv03502
Filed: July 30, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: William H. Orrick
Nature of Suit: American with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 4, 2014 110 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER re 106 Request, filed by Larry Richards. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 03/04/2014. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2014) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/4/2014: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (jmdS, COURT STAFF).
May 9, 2014 129 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS; SEALING RECORDS. San Francisco's motion for summary judgment and judgment on the pleadings is GRANTED. The plaintiffs' complaint (Dkt. No. 1) is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE with respect to plaintiffs Donald Rose, Larry Richards, Elley Fore III, and Raj K. Judge. The complaint is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE with respect to the plaintiffs identified in the original complaint who have not appear ed in this litigation. Mr. Rose's other claims (Dkt. Nos. 93-96, 124-127) are DISMISSED WITHOUT LEAVE TO AMEND and Mr. Roses records at Docket Number 54-5 are ordered SEALED. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 05/09/2014. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2014)
August 16, 2013 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE PLAINTIFF FORE'S EMERGENCY EX-PARTE MOTION FOR A TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER re 48 Ex Parte Application filed by Elley Fore, III. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 08/16/2013. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2013) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/16/2013: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (jmdS, COURT STAFF).
September 4, 2013 60 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING PLANTIFFS REQUEST FOR CONTINUANCE OF HEARING ON PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AND DENYING PLAINTIFF FORES MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION re 57 MOTION for Reconsideration and 58 MOTION to Continue. The hearing as to preliminary injunction is continued to 10/18/2013 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor. Plaintiffs shall file their reply brief, if any, by 10/4/2013. At this stage, based on the information presented by the parties to date regarding Mr. Fores situation, the Court is no t in a position to afford any interim relief to Mr. Fore. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 09/04/2013. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2013) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/5/2013: # 1 (Incorrect PDF)Certificate/Proof of Service) (jmdS, COURT STAFF). (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/5/2013: # 2 (Correct PDF) Certificate/Proof of Service) (jmdS, COURT STAFF).
October 11, 2013 68 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING PLAINTIFFS' MOTIONS FOR "EMERGENCY PROTECTION" by Judge William H. Orrick denying plaintiffs' requests at document numbers 64 and 65 . (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2013)
October 31, 2013 77 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION; GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SUPPLEMENTAL MATERIAL; GRANTING PLAINTIFFS LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT by Judge William H. Orrick denying 41 Motion for TRO; granting 71 Motion for Leave to File. At the hearing on the motion for a preliminary injunction, Mr. Richards sought leave to file an amended complaint. The plaintiffs are GRANTED leave to file an amended complaint. Any amended complaint shall be filed by December 31, 2013. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2013)
January 9, 2014 92 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING JANUARY 31, 2014 DEADLINE TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT - The Court extends the deadline for plaintiffs to file an amended complaint untilJanuary 31, 2014 to afford plaintiffs time to determine whether counsel will represent them in thi s case and, if so, prepare an amended complaint. Whether or not plaintiffs obtain counsel, or anything else occurs between now and then, the last day for plaintiffs to amend their complaint is January 31, 2014. Otherwise, the existing complaint shall be treated as the operative pleading.Amended Pleadings due by 1/31/2014. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 01/09/2014. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rose et al v. Rhorer et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christine
Represented By: Christine Van Aken
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dee
Represented By: Christine Van Aken
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bevan Dufty
Represented By: Christine Van Aken
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ed De Masi
Represented By: Christine Van Aken
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bernard Gunther
Represented By: Christine Van Aken
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Walton
Represented By: Christine Van Aken
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joyce Grim
Represented By: Christine Van Aken
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Arcelona
Represented By: Christine Van Aken
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edwin M. Lee
Represented By: Christine Van Aken
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trent Rhorer
Represented By: Christine Van Aken
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: San Francisco Board of Supervisors
Represented By: Wayne Kessler Snodgrass
Represented By: Christine Van Aken
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The San Francisco Department of Human Services
Represented By: Christine Van Aken
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The San Francisco Department of Aging and Adult Services
Represented By: Christine Van Aken
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Mayor's Office of Hope
Represented By: Christine Van Aken
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis Herrera
Represented By: Christine Van Aken
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Survivors of James Larson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raj K. Judge
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elley Fore, III
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Richards
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Rose
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]