Altec Industries, Inc. v. Walker et al

Plaintiff: Altec Industries, Inc.
Defendant: Edward J. Walker and Idle Reduction Tech
Case Number: 3:2013cv03505
Filed: July 30, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth D. Laporte
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 8, 2014 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte granting 34 Stipulation (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2014)
March 6, 2014 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Chief Judge Elizabeth D Laporte granting in part and denying in part 39 Motion for Leave to File (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2014)
July 11, 2014 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Regarding Conditional Settlement Notice by Chief Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. The parties are ordered to file a brief update with the Court no later than 12:00 p.m. on July 18, 2014.(shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2014)
August 20, 2014 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Setting Status Conference by Chief Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. Status Conference set for 8/26/2014 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte.(shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2014)
November 13, 2014 65 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER setting status conference by Chief Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. A status conference is scheduled for November 25, 2014 at 10:00 a.m., in Courtroom E, located on the 15th Floor at 450 Golden Gate Avenue, San Francisco, California 94102. The parties must file a joint statement regarding status no later than November 18, 2014. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2014)
November 14, 2014 66 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER continuing the status conference by Chief Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. The Court, with the agreement of counsel for the parties, hereby continues the status conference from November 25, 2014 to December 5, 2014 at 9:00 a.m. The joint statement regarding status is now due by November 28, 2014. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2014)
January 12, 2015 74 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 71 Request for an Order Permitting Withdrawal of Counsel by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 1/12/15. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2015)
January 27, 2015 76 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the parties to file a joint status statement by 2/9/2015 by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2015)
February 9, 2015 78 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the parties to file a joint status statement no later than 2/17/15 by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2015)
February 18, 2015 81 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER regarding case status by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. The parties are ordered to file a brief update with the Court no later than February 25, 2015. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2015)
February 25, 2015 83 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER setting a further settlement conference for 3/10/2015 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte.(shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2015)
March 10, 2015 87 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Following Further Case Management Conference by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. As stated at the conference, Plaintiff may file a motion to enforce settlement against Defendant Walker. The motion must be filed no later than March 31, 2015 to be heard on May 5, 2015 at 9:00 a.m. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Altec Industries, Inc. v. Walker et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Altec Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Lindsey Noelle Berg
Represented By: William John Carroll
Represented By: Duane H. Mathiowetz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward J. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Idle Reduction Tech
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]