Moreno v. Lewis

Respondent: Greg D. Lewis
Petitioner: Rudy Moreno
Case Number: 3:2013cv03848
Filed: August 20, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Del Norte
Referring Judge: PSLC MWD
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 6, 2014 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge James Donato granting 10 Motion to Dismiss; granting 11 Motion to Dismiss (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2014)
September 30, 2013 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 9/30/13. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2013)
October 10, 2013 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REOPENING CASE. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 10/10/13. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/10/2013)
March 5, 2014 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Habeas Answer due by 6/3/2014. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 3/5/14. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moreno v. Lewis
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Greg D. Lewis
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Rudy Moreno
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]