Castillo v. Metro Publishing

Plaintiff: Christopher James Castillo
Defendant: Metro Publishing
Case Number: 3:2013cv03850
Filed: August 20, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Referring Judge: PSLC MWD
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 9, 2013 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REOPENING CASE; ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO FILE AN AMENDED COMPLAINT; ORDER DENYING MOTION TO APPOINT COUNSEL. Amended Complaint due by 12/2/2013. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 10/9/13. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Certificate of Service)(cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2013)
October 10, 2013 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS; INSTRUCTIONS TO CLERK. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 10/10/13. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/10/2013)
November 7, 2013 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 11/7/13. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2013)
September 30, 2013 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 9/30/13. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Castillo v. Metro Publishing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher James Castillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metro Publishing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.