White v. Spearman

Petitioner: Michael T. White
Respondent: M. E. Spearman
Case Number: 3:2013cv03917
Filed: August 23, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Monterey
Referring Judge: PSLC MWD
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 12, 2014 19 Opinion or Order of the Court *** FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE SEE DOCKET # 20 *** ORDER EXTENDING TIME. Amended Traverse due by 8/15/2014. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 6/12/14. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2014) Modified on 6/12/2014 (cl, COURT STAFF).
June 12, 2014 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER EXTENDING TIME. Amended Traverse due by 8/15/2014. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 6/12/14. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2014)
January 23, 2015 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 1/23/15. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2015)
March 27, 2015 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: CJA APPOINTMENT OF AND AUTHORITY TO PAY COURT APPOINTED COUNSEL ON APPEAL. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 3/27/15. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2015)
January 6, 2014 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 1/6/14. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2014)
April 3, 2014 9 Opinion or Order of the Court *** FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE IGNORE. *** CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER. Case referred to Private ADR.Class Certification Hearing set for 5/14/2014 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 4/3/14. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2014) Modified on 4/3/2014 (cl, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: White v. Spearman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Michael T. White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: M. E. Spearman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]