Freeman v. Delta Air Lines Inc

Defendant: Delta Air Lines Inc
Plaintiff: Albert John Freeman
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv04179
Filed: September 9, 2013
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S. White
 
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
December 2, 2013 17 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING 16 Stipulation and Proposed Order Selecting Mediation Process. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on December 2, 2013. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2013)
December 5, 2013 23 Featured Case ORDER granting 20 STIPULATION to Continue Case Management Conference. Case Management Statement due by 1/17/2014. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/24/2014 01:30 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 12/4/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2013) Modified on 12/5/2013 (jjoS, COURT STAFF).
April 15, 2014 38 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING AS MODIFIED 37 STIPULATION Attending CMC Telephonically.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 4/14/14. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2014)
April 21, 2014 41 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING 40 Stipulated Protective Order. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 4/21/14. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2014)
September 16, 2013 7 Featured Case ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Judge Executive Committee on 9/16/13. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Freeman v. Delta Air Lines Inc
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delta Air Lines Inc
Represented By: David H.S. Commins
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Albert John Freeman
Represented By: John Wade Carpenter
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]