Evolutionary Intelligence, LLC v. Facebook, Inc. Featured Case

Plaintiff: Evolutionary Intelligence, LLC
Defendant: Facebook Inc.
Case Number: 3:2013cv04202
Filed: September 11, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Scott Corley
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 11, 2013 115 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 1/2/2014. Case Management Conference set for 1/9/2014 01:30 PM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order)(slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2013)
September 11, 2013 114 Case transferred in from District of Texas Eastern; Case Number 6:12-cv-00784. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
September 10, 2013 Interdistrict transfer to the Northern District of California, per Judge, due to notice of no opposition filed so no longer holding for 20 days. (sm, )
August 30, 2013 113 NOTICE by Evolutionary Intelligence, LLC re 112 Order on Motion to Change Venue Evolutionary Intelligence's Notice of Non-Opposition to Magistrate's Report & Recommendation (McCrary, Marie)
August 27, 2013 112 Featured Case ORDER granting 16 Motion to Change Venue. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 8/27/13. (bas, )
August 21, 2013 111 Featured Case ORDER denying 83 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 08/21/13. (mll, )
August 19, 2013 110 NOTICE by Evolutionary Intelligence, LLC OF INITIAL DISCLOSURES (Ainsworth, Charles)
August 19, 2013 109 NOTICE by Facebook, Inc. of Service of Initial Disclosures (Chen, Reuben)
July 3, 2013 108 Featured Case ORDER denying 50 Sealed Patent Motion to disqualify counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 7/3/2013. (sm, )
July 2, 2013 107 NOTICE of Designation of Attorney in Charge to Todd M Kennedy on behalf of Evolutionary Intelligence, LLC (Kennedy, Todd)
June 28, 2013 106 Featured Case ORDER granting 103 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 6/28/13. (bas, )
June 28, 2013 105 Featured Case ORDER REGARDING E-DISCOVERY signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 6/28/13. (bas, )
June 27, 2013 104 NOTICE by Evolutionary Intelligence, LLC JOINT SUBMISSION OF PROPOSED PROTECTIVE ORDER AND ESI ORDER (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order - ESI Order, # 2 Text of Proposed Order - Protective Order, # 3 Affidavit Declaration of Reuben Chen, # 4 Exhibit A to Declaration of Chen, # 5 Exhibit B to Declaration of Chen, # 6 Exhibit C to Declaration of Chen, # 7 Exhibit D to Declaration of Chen)(Ainsworth, Charles)
June 27, 2013 103 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File PROPOSED PROTECTIVE ORDER AND ESI ORDER by Evolutionary Intelligence, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ainsworth, Charles)
June 24, 2013 102 Featured Case ORDER granting 99 Motion for Leave to File Surreply in Excess Pages. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 6/24/2013. (sm, )
June 24, 2013 101 Featured Case ORDER granting 98 Motion to Seal Document 100 Sealed Reply to Response to Motion,. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 6/24/2013. (sm, )
June 23, 2013 100 SEALED Surreply to REPLY to Response to Motion re 50 Emergency SEALED PATENT MOTION TO DISQUALIFY COUNSEL filed by Cooley LLP. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Ron A. Metzger, # 2 Exhibit A to Metzger Declaration, # 3 Supplemental Declaration of Jodie M. Bourdet)(Mason, Lori)
June 23, 2013 99 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages (Re Defendants Surreply in support of its Opposition to Plaintiff's Emergency Opposed Motion to Disqualify Cooley LLP) by Cooley LLP. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Mason, Lori)
June 23, 2013 98 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Document (Defendants' Surreply in support of its Opposition to Plaintiff's Emergency Opposed Motion to Disqualify Cooley LLP) by Cooley LLP. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Mason, Lori)
June 21, 2013 97 RESPONSE in Opposition re 83 Opposed MOTION for Reconsideration re 72 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Mace, Andrew)
June 20, 2013 96 Featured Case ORDER that on or before Monday June 24, 2013 at 8:00 am, dfts shall file a surreply re 50 Emergency SEALED PATENT MOTION TO DISQUALIFY COUNSEL filed by Evolutionary Intelligence, LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 6/20/2013. (sm, )
June 20, 2013 95 Featured Case ORDER granting 84 Motion for Extension of Time to File protective order; granting 94 Motion for Extension of Time to File protective orders. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 6/20/2013. (sm, )
June 19, 2013 94 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Proposed Protective Order by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Chen, Reuben)
June 19, 2013 93 SEALED PATENT REPLY to Response to PATENT Motion re 50 Emergency SEALED PATENT MOTION TO DISQUALIFY COUNSEL filed by Evolutionary Intelligence, LLC. (replaces docket # 90) (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Supplemental Declaration of Michael De Angelo, # 2 Exhibit 1)(Patek, Anthony)
June 19, 2013 92 Featured Case ORDER granting 91 Motion to Seal Document (Reply in support of motion to disqualify). Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 6/19/2013. (sm, )
June 19, 2013 NOTICE of DEFICIENCY regarding the #90 Sealed Motion submitted by Evolutionary Intelligence, LLC. No certificate of authority was included and Wrong Event was used to file (not a motion). Correction should be made by 1 business day and refiled. This motion is now TERMINATED. (sm, )
June 18, 2013 91 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Document (Plainitff's Reply in Support of Motion to Disqualify) by Evolutionary Intelligence, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Unopposed Motion to Seal)(Patek, Anthony) Modified on 6/19/2013 (sm, ).
June 18, 2013 90 ***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT, PLEASE IGNORE***Opposed SEALED MOTION Plainitff's Reply in Support of Motion to Disqualify by Evolutionary Intelligence, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Supplemental Declaration of Michael De Angelo, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Supplemental declaration of Michael de Angelo)(Patek, Anthony) Modified on 6/19/2013 (sm, ).
June 18, 2013 89 Featured Case ORDER granting 88 Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 6/18/2013. (sm, )
June 17, 2013 88 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 76 Sealed Response to Motion,, Motion to Disqualify by Evolutionary Intelligence, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Extension of of Motion to Disqualify)(Patek, Anthony)
June 17, 2013 87 Featured Case ORDER granting extension to file protective orders. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 6/17/2013. (sm, )
June 17, 2013 86 Featured Case ORDER granting 85 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 50 Emergency SEALED PATENT MOTION TO DISQUALIFY COUNSEL Replies due by 6/17/2013 and reply and sur-replies shall be increased by three pages.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 6/17/2013. (sm, )
June 13, 2013 85 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 76 Sealed Response to Motion,, Plaintiff's Motion to Disqualify Cooley LLP as Counsel of Record for Facebook and Millennial Media by Evolutionary Intelligence, LLC. (Patek, Anthony) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/14/2013: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (gsg, ).
June 12, 2013 84 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Proposed Protective Order by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Chen, Reuben) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/13/2013: # 2 REVISED ORDER) (sm, ).
June 11, 2013 83 Opposed MOTION for Reconsideration re 72 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct by Evolutionary Intelligence, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kennedy, Todd)
June 7, 2013 82 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Shannon Marie Dacus on behalf of Facebook, Inc. (Dacus, Shannon)
June 5, 2013 81 Featured Case SCHEDULING AND DISCOVERY ORDER:Markman Hearing set for 4/22/2014 10:00 AM in (Tyler) before Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 6/5/2013. (sm, )
June 5, 2013 80 Featured Case MOTION PRACTICE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 6/5/2013. (sm, )
June 5, 2013 79 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven: Scheduling Conference held on 6/5/2013. (Court Reporter Jill McFadden.) (lfs, )
June 3, 2013 78 Featured Case ORDER granting 75 Motion for Leave to File in excess pages. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 6/3/2013. (sm, )
June 3, 2013 77 Featured Case ORDER granting 74 Motion for Leave to File a sealed document. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 6/3/2013. (sm, )
May 31, 2013 76 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 50 Emergency SEALED PATENT MOTION TO DISQUALIFY COUNSEL filed by Cooley LLP. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Thomas A. Coll, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit A to Coll Declaration, # 3 Exhibit B to Coll Declaration, # 4 Exhibit C to Coll Declaration, # 5 Declaration of Jodie M. Bourdet, # 6Exhibit A to Bourdet Declaration, # 7 Declaration of William S. Galliani, # 8 Exhibit A to Galliani Declaration, # 9 Declaration of Scott A. Cole, # 10 Exhibit Exhibit A to Cole Declaration, # 11 Declaration of Rebecca Buchanan, # 12 Text of Proposed Order)(Mason, Lori)
May 31, 2013 75 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Cooley LLP. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Mason, Lori)
May 31, 2013 74 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Opposition to Plaintiff's Emergency Motion to Disqualify by Cooley LLP. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Mason, Lori)
May 29, 2013 73 Featured Case ORDER granting 71 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 5/29/13. (bas, )
May 28, 2013 72 Featured Case ORDER denying 34 Motion to Amend. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 5/28/13. (bas, )
May 28, 2013 71 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Evolutionary Intelligence, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kennedy, Todd)
May 28, 2013 70 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 16 MOTION to Change Venue to the United States District Court for the Northern District of California filed by Evolutionary Intelligence, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Todd Kennedy, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3)(Kennedy, Todd)
May 23, 2013 69 NOTICE by Evolutionary Intelligence, LLC of Disclosure of Asserted Claims and Infringement Contentions PR 3-1 and 3-2 (Ainsworth, Charles)
May 22, 2013 68 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Safier, Seth)
May 17, 2013 67 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Marie Ann McCrary on behalf of Evolutionary Intelligence, LLC (McCrary, Marie)
May 16, 2013 66 Featured Case ORDER granting 64 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. The new deadline is MAY 31, 2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 5/16/13. (bas, )
May 16, 2013 65 Featured Case ORDER granting 62 Motion to Seal Document. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 5/16/13. (bas, )
May 15, 2013 64 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 50 Emergency SEALED PATENT MOTION TO DISQUALIFY COUNSEL by Cooley LLP. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Mason, Lori)
May 15, 2013 63 SEALED PATENT REPLY to Response to PATENT Motion re 16 MOTION to Change Venue to the United States District Court for the Northern District of California, 62 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Document Facebook's Reply In Support of Its Motion to Transfer Venue to the United States District Court for the Northern District of California filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Dave Williams, # 2 Affidavit of James Tedford, # 3 Affidavit of Scott Ward, # 4 Affidavit of Reuben Chen, # 5 Exhibit 1 to R. Chen Declaration, # 6 Exhibit 2 to R. Chen Declaration, # 7 Exhibit 3 Part 1 of 3 to R Chen Declaration, # 8 Exhibit 3 Part 2 of 3 to R Chen Declaration, # 9 Exhibit 3 Part 3 of 3 to R Chen Declaration, # 10 Exhibit 4 to R Chen Declaration, # 11 Exhibit 5 to R Chen Declaration, # 12 Exhibit 6 to R Chen Declaration, # 13 Exhibit 7 to R Chen Declaration, # 14 Exhibit 8 to R Chen Declaration, # 15 Exhibit 9 to R Chen Declaration, # 16 Exhibit 10 to R Chen Declaration)(Chen, Reuben)
May 15, 2013 62 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Document Facebook's Reply In Support of Its Motion to Transfer Venue to the United States District Court for the Northern District of California by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Chen, Reuben)
May 15, 2013 61 Featured Case ORDER granting 57 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 5/15/13. (bas, )
May 14, 2013 60 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Andrew Carter Mace on behalf of Facebook, Inc. (Mace, Andrew)
May 14, 2013 59 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Lori R Mason on behalf of Cooley LLP (Mason, Lori)
May 14, 2013 58 NOTICE by Evolutionary Intelligence, LLC CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES (Patek, Anthony)
May 14, 2013 57 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages Re Reply to Motion to Transfer by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Chen, Reuben)
May 14, 2013 56 NOTICE by Facebook, Inc. of Certificate of Interested Persons (Keefe, Heidi)
May 13, 2013 55 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Scott A Cole on behalf of Cooley LLP. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4135550. (Cole, Scott)
May 13, 2013 54 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Ann M Mooney on behalf of Cooley LLP. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4135532. (Mooney, Ann)
May 3, 2013 53 Featured Case ORDER granting 48 Motion to seal pla motion to disqualify. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 5/3/2013. (sm, )
May 3, 2013 52 Featured Case ORDER granting 49 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 5/3/2013. (sm, )
May 2, 2013 51 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 34 Opposed MOTION to Amend/Correct 9 Amended Complaint Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Chen, Reuben)
May 2, 2013 50 Emergency SEALED PATENT MOTION TO DISQUALIFY COUNSEL by Evolutionary Intelligence, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Michael De Angelo, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J, # 12 Exhibit K, # 13 Exhibit L, # 14 Exhibit M, # 15 Exhibit N, # 16 Exhibit O, # 17 Exhibit P, # 18 Exhibit Q, # 19 Exhibit R, # 20 Text of Proposed Order)(Patek, Anthony)
May 2, 2013 49 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Evolutionary Intelligence, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Patek, Anthony)
May 2, 2013 48 Unopposed MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL PLAINTIFF'S EMERGENCY OPPOSED MOTION TO DISQUALIFY by Evolutionary Intelligence, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Patek, Anthony)
April 29, 2013 47 Featured Case ORDER regarding issues to be discussed at scheduling conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 4/29/13. (bas, )
April 29, 2013 46 Featured Case ORDER TO MEET, REPORT AND APPEAR AT SCHEDULING CONFERENCE, ( Scheduling Conference set for 6/5/2013 10:00 AM in Judge Stegers Courtroom (Tyler) before Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven.). Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 4/29/2013. (sm, )
April 26, 2013 45 NOTICE by Evolutionary Intelligence, LLC of Readiness for Scheduling Conference (Kennedy, Todd)
April 23, 2013 44 Featured Case ORDER granting 43 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 4/23/13. (bas, )
April 22, 2013 43 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Evolutionary Intelligence, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kennedy, Todd)
April 22, 2013 42 REPLY to Response to Motion re 34 Opposed MOTION to Amend/Correct 9 Amended Complaint filed by Evolutionary Intelligence, LLC. (Kennedy, Todd)
April 17, 2013 41 Featured Case ORDER granting 40 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 16 MOTION to Change Venue to the United States District Court for the Northern District of California Replies due by 5/15/2013.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 4/17/2013. (sm, )
April 16, 2013 40 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 16 MOTION to Change Venue to the United States District Court for the Northern District of California by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Chen, Reuben)
April 11, 2013 39 RESPONSE to Motion re 34 Opposed MOTION to Amend/Correct 9 Amended Complaint filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Reuben Chen, # 2 Exhibit A - BlinQ Media, # 3 Exhibit B - Brand Networks, # 4 Exhibit C - Nanigans Partners, # 5 Exhibit D - Chen Letter, # 6 Exhibit E - BlindQ Media Locations, # 7 Exhibit F - Brand Networks Location, # 8 Exhibit G - Nanigans Location)(Chen, Reuben)
April 8, 2013 38 RESPONSE in Opposition re 16 MOTION to Change Venue to the United States District Court for the Northern District of California filed by Evolutionary Intelligence, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kennedy, Todd)
April 1, 2013 37 Featured Case ORDER granting 36 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 16 MOTION to Change Venue to the United States District Court for the Northern District of California Responses due by 4/8/2013 Replies due by 4/29/2013.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 4/1/2013. (sm, )
March 28, 2013 36 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 16 MOTION to Change Venue to the United States District Court for the Northern District of California by Evolutionary Intelligence, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kennedy, Todd)
March 25, 2013 35 ***WITHDRAWN PER ORDER #72 WHICH DENIED LEAVE TO FILE***SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against Facebook, Inc., BLiNQ Media, LLC, Brand Networks, Inc., Nanigans, Inc., filed by Evolutionary Intelligence, LLC.(Kennedy, Todd)
March 25, 2013 34 Opposed MOTION to Amend/Correct 9 Amended Complaint by Evolutionary Intelligence, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Kennedy, Todd)
March 11, 2013 33 Featured Case ORDER granting 32 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 16 MOTION to Change Venue to the United States District Court for the Northern District of California Responses due by 4/1/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 3/11/2013. (sm, )
March 8, 2013 32 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 16 MOTION to Change Venue to the United States District Court for the Northern District of California by Evolutionary Intelligence, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kennedy, Todd)
February 27, 2013 31 Featured Case ORDER denying 25 Motion to Stay. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 2/28/2013. (sm, )
February 14, 2013 30 REPLY to Response to Motion re 25 MOTION to Stay Proceeding Pending Resolution of Facebook's Motion to Transfer filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Chen, Reuben)
February 6, 2013 29 Featured Case ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven for all pretrial proceedings. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 02/06/13. cc:attys 2-07-13(mll, )
February 4, 2013 28 RESPONSE in Opposition re 25 MOTION to Stay Proceeding Pending Resolution of Facebook's Motion to Transfer filed by Evolutionary Intelligence, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kennedy, Todd)
January 30, 2013 27 AFFIDAVIT in Support re 25 MOTION to Stay Proceeding Pending Resolution of Facebook's Motion to Transfer filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Chen, Reuben)
January 28, 2013 26 ***FILED IN ERROR. SEE ENTRY 27 FOR CORRECTED FILING.*** AFFIDAVIT in Support re 25 MOTION to Stay Proceeding Pending Resolution of Facebook's Motion to Transfer filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Chen, Reuben) Modified on 2/1/2013 (gsg).
January 28, 2013 25 MOTION to Stay Proceeding Pending Resolution of Facebook's Motion to Transfer by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion to Stay)(Chen, Reuben)
January 24, 2013 24 Featured Case ORDER granting 23 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 16 MOTION to Change Venue to the United States District Court for the Northern District of California. Responses due by 3/8/2013. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 1/24/2013. (gsg)
January 22, 2013 23 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Opposition to Motion to Transfer Venue by Evolutionary Intelligence, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Safier, Seth)
January 17, 2013 22 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Reuben Chen on behalf of Facebook, Inc. (Chen, Reuben)
January 15, 2013 21 Order reassigning this case to United States District Judge Michael H. Schneider per General Order 13-3. Please see Appendix D: Addendum Regarding Cases Assigned to Judge Schneider. Judge Leonard Davis no longer assigned to the case. (tlh, )
January 11, 2013 20 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Deron R Dacus on behalf of Facebook, Inc. (Dacus, Deron)
January 10, 2013 19 Featured Case ORDER granting 18 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 16 MOTION to Change Venue to the United States District Court for the Northern District of California; Responses due by 1/21/2013. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 01/10/13. cc:attys 1-10-13 (mll, )
January 7, 2013 18 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 16 MOTION to Change Venue to the United States District Court for the Northern District of California by Evolutionary Intelligence, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kennedy, Todd)
January 4, 2013 17 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Todd M Kennedy on behalf of Evolutionary Intelligence, LLC (Kennedy, Todd)
December 21, 2012 16 MOTION to Change Venue to the United States District Court for the Northern District of California by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Reuben H. Chen, # 2 Exhibit A - Patent Assignement, # 3 Exhibit B - Michael De Angelo webpage, # 4 Exhibit C - Google Map Distance from Facebook to Courthouse, # 5 Exhibit D - James Okamoto webpage, # 6 Exhibit E - Tamara Fraizer webpage, # 7 Exhibit F - Dorian Cartwright webpage, # 8 Exhibit G - Sanjeet Dutta webpage, # 9 Exhibit H - Carl Kukkonen webpage, # 10 Exhibit I - William Hunter webpage, # 11 Exhibit J - Mark Shean webpage, # 12 Exhibit K - Greg Sueoka Contact Info, # 13 Exhibit L - Google Map from Salt Lake City, UT to San Francisoc, CA, # 14 Exhibit M - Google map from Salt Lake City, UT to Tyler, TX, # 15 Exhibit N - Greg Sueoka webpage, # 16 Exhibit O - Table C-5 of the Federal Judicial Caseload Statisctics 2011, # 17 Exhibit P - Apple's Form 10-K, # 18 Exhibit Q - Twitter contact info., # 19 Exhibit R - Yelp Form 10-Q, # 20 Exhibit S - Foursquare's Jobs webpage, # 21 Exhibit T - Groupon Engineering Jobs webpage, # 22 Exhibit U - Livingsocial webpage, # 23 Exhibit V - Millenial Media webpage, # 24 Affidavit Jeremy Jordan, # 25 Text of Proposed Order)(Keefe, Heidi)
December 20, 2012 15 NOTICE by Evolutionary Intelligence, LLC NOTICE CASE READY FOR SCHEDULING CONFERENCE (Ainsworth, Charles)
December 17, 2012 14 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Anthony Jude Patek on behalf of Evolutionary Intelligence, LLC (Patek, Anthony)
December 14, 2012 13 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Facebook, Inc. (Keefe, Heidi)
December 14, 2012 12 ANSWER to 9 Amended Complaint by Facebook, Inc..(Keefe, Heidi)
December 14, 2012 11 NOTICE by Evolutionary Intelligence, LLC of Joint Stipulation to Allow Evolutionary Intelligence to File First Amended Complaint (Patek, Anthony)
December 13, 2012 10 ***FILED IN ERROR. SEE ENTRY 11 FOR CORRECTED FILING.*** AMENDED COMPLAINT Joint Stipulation Allowing First Amended Complaint for Patent Infringement against Facebook, Inc., filed by Evolutionary Intelligence, LLC.(Patek, Anthony) Modified on 12/17/2012 (gsg).
December 13, 2012 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT First Amended Complaint For Patent Infringement against Facebook, Inc., filed by Evolutionary Intelligence, LLC.(Patek, Anthony)
December 10, 2012 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Seth A Safier on behalf of Evolutionary Intelligence, LLC (Safier, Seth)
November 13, 2012 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint 7 is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Facebook, Inc. to 12/13/2012. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mll, )
November 9, 2012 7 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Facebook, Inc..( Keefe, Heidi)
November 2, 2012 6 Return of Service Executed as to Facebook, Inc. on 10/23/2012, by personal service; answer due: 11/13/2012. (mll, )
October 24, 2012 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert Christopher Bunt on behalf of Evolutionary Intelligence, LLC (Bunt, Robert)
October 18, 2012 4 SUMMONS Issued as to Facebook, Inc. and emailed to pltf for service. (klb)
October 17, 2012 Judge Leonard Davis added. (mll, )
October 17, 2012 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Evolutionary Intelligence, LLC (Ainsworth, Charles)
October 17, 2012 2 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Ainsworth, Charles)
October 17, 2012 1 COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against Facebook, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0540-3833480.), filed by Evolutionary Intelligence, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit A '536 Patent, # 3 Exhibit B '682 Patent)(Ainsworth, Charles)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Evolutionary Intelligence, LLC v. Facebook, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Evolutionary Intelligence, LLC
Represented By: Seth A Safier
Represented By: Anthony Jude Patek
Represented By: Marie Ann McCrary
Represented By: Todd Michael Kennedy
Represented By: Todd M Kennedy
Represented By: Robert Christopher Bunt
Represented By: Charles Ainsworth
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Facebook Inc.
Represented By: Deron R Dacus
Represented By: Reuben Chen
Represented By: Shannon Marie Dacus
Represented By: Heidi Lyn Keefe
Represented By: Andrew Carter Mace
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]