Evolutionary Intelligence, LLC v. Groupon, Inc.

Plaintiff: Evolutionary Intelligence, LLC
Defendant: Groupon Inc.
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv04204
Filed: September 11, 2013
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
 
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
January 23, 2014 104 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS FOR A STAY 96 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 1/23/2014)
June 23, 2014 110 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER to show cause re consolidation. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 6/23/14. (rmwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2014)
October 8, 2013 78 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO RELATE CASE re 77 Notice (Other) filed by Evolutionary Intelligence, LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 10/8/13. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2013)
November 4, 2013 87 Opinion or Order of the Court Judge Illston's Standing ORDER (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2013)
November 5, 2013 88 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting 85 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2013)
November 5, 2013 89 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting 84 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2013)
December 12, 2013 98 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Motions terminated: 94 MOTION Miscellaneous Administrative Request to Move Initial Case Management Conference Date filed by Groupon Inc.. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/19/13 is continued to 1/24/2014 02:30 PM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 12/12/13. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Evolutionary Intelligence, LLC v. Groupon, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Evolutionary Intelligence, LLC
Represented By: Seth A Safier
Represented By: Anthony Jude Patek
Represented By: Marie Ann McCrary
Represented By: Todd Michael Kennedy
Represented By: Todd M Kennedy
Represented By: Robert Christopher Bunt
Represented By: Charles Ainsworth
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Groupon Inc.
Represented By: Thomas L. Duston
Represented By: Jennifer Haltom Doan
Represented By: Tron Fu
Represented By: Todd Michael Kennedy
Represented By: Scott Allen Sanderson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]