Nero v. BAE Systems Inc. et al

Defendant: BAE Systems San Francisco Ship Repair, Inc., BAE Systems Ship Repair, Inc., BAE Systems, Inc., Hugh Vanderspek and Jim Vaught
Plaintiff: Martin J. Nero, Jr
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv04271
Filed: September 13, 2013
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Phyllis J. Hamilton
 
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
September 27, 2013 36 Featured Case ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton. Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Judge Executive Committee on 9/27/13. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2013)
October 1, 2013 39 Featured Case ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 12/5/2013. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/12/2013 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 10/1/13. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2013)
November 25, 2013 61 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Hamilton denying 51 Motion to Remand (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2013)
January 24, 2014 70 Featured Case CASE MANAGEMENT AND PRETRIAL ORDER re 69 Case Management Conference - Initial. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 1/24/14. (nahS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2014)
March 31, 2014 75 Featured Case REVISED CASE MANAGEMENT AND PRETRIAL ORDER re 74 Case Management Conference - Further. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 3/31/14. (nahS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Nero v. BAE Systems Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BAE Systems San Francisco Ship Repair, Inc.
Represented By: Lynn A Kappelman
Represented By: Eric Michael Lloyd
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BAE Systems Ship Repair, Inc.
Represented By: Lynn A Kappelman
Represented By: Eric Michael Lloyd
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BAE Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Eric Michael Lloyd
Represented By: Lynn A Kappelman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hugh Vanderspek
Represented By: Lynn A Kappelman
Represented By: Eric Michael Lloyd
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jim Vaught
Represented By: Lynn A Kappelman
Represented By: Eric Michael Lloyd
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martin J. Nero, Jr
Represented By: Carla Vanessa Minnard
Represented By: Micha Star Liberty
Represented By: Mika Marie Hilaire
Represented By: Simona A. Farrise
Represented By: Sharon Joellen Arkin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]