Freeman v. SCVNGR Inc

Plaintiff: Albert John Freeman
Defendant: SCVNGR Inc
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv04294
Filed: September 16, 2013
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: William H. Orrick
 
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
December 24, 2013 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge William Orrick continuing CMC set for January 6, 2014 until January 22, 2014, finding as moot 20 Motion to Continue; finding as moot 21 Motion to Shorten Time (wholc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/24/2013)
January 17, 2014 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 01/17/2014. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2014)
September 18, 2013 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. William H. Orrick. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 9/18/13. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2013)
September 19, 2013 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/7/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 09/19/2013. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Freeman v. SCVNGR Inc
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Albert John Freeman
Represented By: John Wade Carpenter
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SCVNGR Inc
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]