Delaat et al v. Dhillon et al

Defendant: Kulbar Dhillon and Rajinder Dhillon
Plaintiff: Andrea L. Delaat, Erik Delaat and Anneke Delaat
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv04605
Filed: October 4, 2013
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Napa
Presiding Judge: Donna M. Ryu
 
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
January 9, 2014 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 24 STIPULATION to Continue Case Management Conference. Case Management Statement due by 4/18/2014. Case Management Conference set for 4/25/2014 11:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 1/9/14. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2014)
January 30, 2014 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING HEARING ON MOTION TO REMAND. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 1/29/14. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2014)
March 13, 2014 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR REMAND AND GRANTING DEFENDANTS REQUEST TO REFER MATTER TO UNITED STATES BANKRUPTCY COURT (SANTA ROSE DIVISION). Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 3/13/14. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Delaat et al v. Dhillon et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kulbar Dhillon
Represented By: Marshall E. Bluestone
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rajinder Dhillon
Represented By: Marshall E. Bluestone
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrea L. Delaat
Represented By: Richard V. Day
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erik Delaat
Represented By: Richard V. Day
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anneke Delaat
Represented By: Richard V. Day
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]