Delphix Corp. v. Actifio, Inc.

Plaintiff: Delphix Corp.
Defendant: Actifio, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2013cv04613
Filed: October 4, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M. Cousins
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 17, 2014 104 Opinion or Order of the Court Order granting 96 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. Plaintiff shall file the redacted version of its reply brief into the public record within four (4) days of the date of this order. Signed by Hon. Beth Labson Freeman on 10/17/2014.(blflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2014)
November 13, 2014 118 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 103 Motion to Stay Pending Inter Partes Review. This action is PARTIALLY STAYED pending the PTAB's decision on Defendant's petitions for inter partes review of the '808, '07 7, '8944, '361, and '174 Patents. The claim construction briefing and hearing schedule is VACATED. The Court will issue a separate scheduling order notifying the parties of the rescheduled claim construction dates. Case Management Statement due by 4/9/2015. Further Case Management Conference set for 4/16/2015 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Hon. Beth Labson Freeman on 11/13/2014. (blflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2014)
November 18, 2014 119 Opinion or Order of the Court CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Tutorial Hearing set for 8/7/2015 09:00 AM. Markman Hearing set for 8/14/2015 09:00 AM. All hearings in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Hon. Beth Labson Freeman on 11/18/2014. (blflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2014)
November 21, 2014 124 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 122 Stipulation to Change Time; Instructions to Parties. Signed by Hon. Beth Labson Freeman on 11/21/2014. (blflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2014)
December 4, 2013 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Richard Seeborg. Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 12/4/13. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2013)
January 2, 2014 25 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON DEFENDANT ACTIFIO'S MOTION TO DISMISS DELPHIX'S INDIRECT AND WILLFUL INFRINGEMENT CLAIMS AND RESCHEDULING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Conference set for 3/13/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 12/30/13. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/2/2014)
January 15, 2014 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND AND DENYING MOTION TO DISMISS AS MOOT. By Judge Richard Seeborg (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2014)
March 19, 2014 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg granting 33 Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint, with Leave to Amend. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2014)
August 20, 2014 75 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting in Part, Denying in Part 73 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. Signed by Hon. Beth Labson Freeman on 8/20/2014. (blflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2014)
September 2, 2014 83 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Modifying 75 Order re Plaintiff's Administrative Motion to File Under Seal re 73 , 78 . Signed by Hon. Beth Labson Freeman on 9/2/2014. (blflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2014)
September 24, 2014 95 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 73 Motion for Leave to File Fourth Amended Complaint. Signed by Hon. Beth Labson Freeman on 9/24/2014. (blflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Delphix Corp. v. Actifio, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Delphix Corp.
Represented By: Ryan Jared Marton
Represented By: J. David Hadden
Represented By: Phillip John Haack
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actifio, Inc.
Represented By: Srinivas Giriraj Pathmanaban
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]