HP Debt Exchange LLC v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.

Plaintiff: HP Debt Exchange, LLC
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 3:2013cv04717
Filed: October 10, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth D. Laporte
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 12, 2014 28 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Chief Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte granting 7 Motion to Dismiss with leave to amend by no later than February 25, 2014.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2014)
May 1, 2014 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 41 MOTION to Appear by Telephone HP Debt Exchange, LLC.'s Unopposed Motion for Leave of Court For its Counsel to Participate in the Motion to Dismiss and Motion to Strike First Amended Complaint By Telephone filed by HP Debt Exchange, LLC. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 5/1/14. (notewarelS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2014)
May 22, 2014 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Defendant's Request for Telephonic Appearance 44 signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Laporte. Jesse Linebaugh may make an appearance by telephone at the hearing on the Motion to Dismiss scheduled for May 27, 2014 at 9:00 AM. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2014)
August 1, 2014 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Referring Case to Mediation by Chief Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2014)
October 20, 2014 85 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting Defendant's Motion to Dismiss and Denying As Moot Discovery Motions and Sanctions Motions by Chief Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte.(shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HP Debt Exchange LLC v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HP Debt Exchange, LLC
Represented By: Jennifer Nichole Harris
Represented By: Brad A. Mokri
Represented By: Carissa S. Picard
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Jesse Linebaugh
Represented By: Laura Christine Hurtado
Represented By: Bruce A. Ericson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]