Situ et al v. Wong et al

Defendant: UMC Food Corporation, Leland Wong, Matthew Tsai, Bill Wong, David Chun, Connie Chan and Eugene Wong
Plaintiff: Biqi Zhao and Xiong Man Situ
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv05102
Filed: November 1, 2013
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M. Cousins
 
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
January 14, 2014 12 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 11 ORDERING PARTIES TO PRIVATE ADR AND RESCHEDULING RULE 26 CONFERENCE [AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT] Case Management Conference set for 4/3/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 1/14/14. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2014)
April 3, 2014 15 Featured Case CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER. ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge for Settlement. Further Case Management Conference set for 12/4/2014 10:00 AM; Pretrial Conference set for 4/30/2015 10:00 AM; Jury Selection set for 5/11/2015 09:00 AM; Jury Trial set for 5/11/2015 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 4/3/14. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2014)
May 30, 2014 27 Featured Case ORDER Granting Reques for Insurance Carrier Representative to Appear Telephonically at Settlement Conference by Chief Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte.(shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/30/2014)
June 6, 2014 32 Featured Case ORDER Excusing the Settling Defendants from the June 18, 2014 Settlement Conference singed by Chief Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2014)
June 6, 2014 33 Featured Case ORDER Regarding Plaintiff's Request to Compel Attendance and Defendant's Request to Appear Telephonically by Chief Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2014)
July 15, 2014 53 Featured Case ORDER re 51 Letter filed by Eugene Wong. Order Granting Request for Telephonic Appearance by Insurance Carrier Representative. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nandor Vadas on 7/15/2014. (njvlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2014)
July 15, 2014 54 Featured Case ORDER re 52 Notice (Other) filed by Biqi Zhao. Order Granting Plaintiffs' Application for Telephonic Standby Staus. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nandor J. Vadas on 7/15/2014. (njvlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2014)
July 21, 2014 58 Featured Case ORDER CONDITIONALLY DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge James Donato on 7/21/14. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Situ et al v. Wong et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UMC Food Corporation
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leland Wong
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Tsai
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bill Wong
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Chun
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Connie Chan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eugene Wong
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Biqi Zhao
Represented By: Christopher James Rillo
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Xiong Man Situ
Represented By: Christopher James Rillo
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]