Garrison et al v. Whole Foods Market, Inc.

Plaintiff: Mary Garrison and Grace Garrison
Defendant: Whole Foods Market, Inc.
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv05222
Filed: November 8, 2013
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Donna M. Ryu
 
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 31:3731
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
April 10, 2014 25 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 24 TO EXTEND BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT AND MOTION TO STRIKE. Case Management Conference set for 5/29/2014 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Motion Hearing set for 5/29/2014 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 4/10/14. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2014)
May 19, 2014 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing parties to file supplemental briefs by May 26, 2014. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 5/19/14. (vclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2014) Modified on 5/19/2014 (knm, COURT STAFF).
June 2, 2014 37 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Hon. Vince Chhabria granting in part and denying in part 23 Motion To Dismiss and Motion To Strike. (Filed on 6/2/2014)
June 24, 2014 44 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 43 STIPULATION to Continue July 8, 2014 Case Management Conference filed by Whole Foods Market Group, Inc. Case Management Statement due by 7/15/2014. Case Management Conference set for 7/22/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 6/24/2014. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2014)
July 2, 2014 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ALLOWING COMMON LAW CLAIMS TO PROCEED. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 7/2/2014. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2014)
August 6, 2014 50 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 49 STIPULATION Re Initial Schedule filed by Whole Foods Market Group, Inc. Mediation shall be completed by no later than February 2, 2015. Case Management Statement due by 2/3/2015. Further Case Management Conference set for 2/10/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 8/1/2014. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2014)
October 14, 2014 52 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Hon. Vince Chhabria granting 51 Stipulated Protective Order.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Garrison et al v. Whole Foods Market, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Garrison
Represented By: Molly Ann DeSario
Represented By: Jessica Lynn Campbell
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Grace Garrison
Represented By: Molly Ann DeSario
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Whole Foods Market, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]