Viveros Jimenez v. Aitken et al

Respondent: John Sandweg, Rand Beers, Dam Gill, Timothy Aitken, Juan P. Osuna and Eric H. Holder, Jr.
Petitioner: Pedo Viveros Jimenez
Case Number: 3:2013cv05443
Filed: November 22, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Yuba
Presiding Judge: Charles R. Breyer
Nature of Suit: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 13, 2013 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 10 STIPULATION TO VACATE BRIEFING AND HEARING SCHEDULE FOR PLAINTIFFS PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS filed by Timothy Aitken, John Sandweg, Rand Beers, Juan P. Osuna, Dam Gill, Eric H. Holder, Jr.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 12/11/2013. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2013)
December 13, 2013 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 12/12/2013. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2013)
November 22, 2013 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING BRIEFING AND HEARING SCHEDULE. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 11/22/2013. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2013)
November 25, 2013 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 7 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER ON BRIEFING AND HEARING SCHEDULE FOR PLAINTIFFS PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS filed by Timothy Aitken, et al. Reset Deadlines as to 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MO TION for Preliminary Injunctio. Responses due by 12/9/2013. Replies due by 12/13/2013. Motion Hearing reset for 12/18/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Charles R. Breyer. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 11/25/2013. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Viveros Jimenez v. Aitken et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: John Sandweg
Represented By: Victoria R. Carradero
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Rand Beers
Represented By: Victoria R. Carradero
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Dam Gill
Represented By: Victoria R. Carradero
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Timothy Aitken
Represented By: Victoria R. Carradero
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Juan P. Osuna
Represented By: Victoria R. Carradero
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Eric H. Holder, Jr.
Represented By: Victoria R. Carradero
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Pedo Viveros Jimenez
Represented By: Zachary Miller Nightingale
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]