Alexis et al v. Corinthian Colleges, Inc.

Plaintiff: Edith Lopez, Darice Nichols and Carmelita Alexis
Defendant: Corinthian Colleges, Inc.
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv05446
Filed: November 25, 2013
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth D. Laporte
 
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
January 17, 2014 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 2/20/2014. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/27/2014 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 1/17/14. (nahS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2014)
April 2, 2014 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Hamilton granting 26 Motion to Dismiss (pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2014)
May 15, 2014 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING PARTIES TO SUBMIT JOINT PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER BY MAY 29, 2014. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 5/15/14. (vclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2014)
June 5, 2014 48 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 44 Stipulation filed by Carmelita Alexis, Tracy Davis, Edith Lopez, Darice Nichols, Set/Reset Deadlines as to 44 Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to 42 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint. Responses due by 6/13/2014. Replies due by 6/23/2014. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 6/5/2014. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2014)
July 2, 2014 53 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND MODIFIED ORDER re 52 STIPULATION re 42 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint, 49 Clerks Notice, Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings, To Continue Hearing On Motion To Dismiss Second Amended Complaint filed by Corinthian Colleges, Inc. Motion Hearing set for 7/10/2014 01:30 PM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Vince Chhabria. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 7/2/2014. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2014)
July 8, 2014 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Vince Chhabria granting in part and denying in part 42 Motion to Dismiss (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Alexis et al v. Corinthian Colleges, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edith Lopez
Represented By: Tammy L. Hussin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darice Nichols
Represented By: Tammy L. Hussin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carmelita Alexis
Represented By: Tammy L. Hussin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corinthian Colleges, Inc.
Represented By: Robert Travis Campbell
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]