St. Matthews Baptist Church of Livermore, Inc. v. Foundation Capital Resources, Inc.

Plaintiff: St. Matthews Baptist Church of Livermore, Inc.
Defendant: Foundation Capital Resources, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2013cv05765
Filed: December 12, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 31, 2014 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion 8 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint : Motion Hearing set for 3/13/2014 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 1/31/2014. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2014)
February 21, 2014 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 3/13/2014 10:00 AM. Show Cause Response due by 2/27/2014. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on February 21, 2014. (mejlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/21/2014)
March 10, 2014 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Staying Case, ***Deadlines terminated. 17 Joint Case Management Statement, filed by St. Matthews Baptist Church of Livermore, Inc.. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on March 10, 2014. (mejlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2014)
May 28, 2014 23 Opinion or Order of the Court STATUS ORDER: Defendant's Motion to Dismiss due by 6/19/2014. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 5/28/2014. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2014)
August 18, 2014 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Maria-Elena James granting 25 Motion to Dismiss Breach of Contract Claim; granting 26 Motion to Expunge Lis Pendens (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2014)
August 18, 2014 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Case Management Conference set for 9/11/2014 in Courtroom B. Case Management Statement due by 9/4/2014. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 8/18/2014. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2014) .
September 30, 2014 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 48 Notice (Other) filed by St. Matthews Baptist Church of Livermore, Inc.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James on 9/30/2014. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2014)
February 6, 2015 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Maria-Elena James granting 55 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Schreiber & Schreiber shall remain as counsel of record for purposes of forwarding papers from the Court and Defendant. St. Matthews shall file substitution of counsel by March 23, 2015 (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2015)
March 25, 2015 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE, ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 3/25/2015. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: St. Matthews Baptist Church of Livermore, Inc. v. Foundation Capital Resources, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: St. Matthews Baptist Church of Livermore, Inc.
Represented By: Eric Andrew Schreiber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foundation Capital Resources, Inc.
Represented By: Douglas Henry Kraft
Represented By: John Henry McCardle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.