BlackBerry Limited v. Typo Products LLC Featured Case

Plaintiff: BlackBerry Limited
Defendant: Typo Products LLC
 
Case Number: 3:2014cv00023
Filed: January 3, 2014
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge: William H. Orrick
 
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 15:1126
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:
Date Filed#Document Text
October 21, 2014 Set/Reset Hearing - Tutorial vacated. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2014)
October 21, 2014 108 Featured Case ORDER REGARDING TECHNICAL TUTORIAL CURRENTLY SCHEDULED FOR NOVEMBER 7, 2014 by Hon. William H. Orrick granting 105 Stipulation. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2014)
October 21, 2014 107 Featured Case ORDER re 104 Notice of Change In Counsel filed by Typo Products LLC. Attorneys Olivier Alain Taillieu and Raffi Vaheh Zerounian terminated. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 10/21/2014. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2014)
October 10, 2014 106 Featured Case ORDER REGARDING PARTIES' DISCOVERY DISPUTE re 103 Statement. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 10/10/2014. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/10/2014)
October 10, 2014 105 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Technical Tutorial filed by BlackBerry Limited. (Briggs, Todd) (Filed on 10/10/2014)
October 10, 2014 104 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Olivier Alain Taillieu [Request for Approval of Withdrawal of Counsel] (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Taillieu, Olivier) (Filed on 10/10/2014)
October 9, 2014 103 Statement Joint Statement Regarding Discovery Disputes Pursuant To Paragraph 4 Of The Courts Standing Order by BlackBerry Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - BlackBerry Contempt Interrogatories to Typo, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Typo Response to Contempt Interrogatories, # 3 Exhibit 3 - Typo Supplemental Response to Contempt Interrogatories, # 4 Exhibit 4 - BlackBerry Contempt RFPs to Typo, # 5 Exhibit 5 - Typo Response to Contempt RFPs)(Briggs, Todd) (Filed on 10/9/2014)
October 8, 2014 102 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION STATEMENT BlackBerry Opening Claim Construction Brief filed by BlackBerry Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Second Declaration of Brice C. Lynch In Support Of BlackBerry's Opening Claim Construction Brief, # 2 Exhibit 2nd Lynch CC Decl Ex. 1, # 3 Exhibit 2nd Lynch CC Decl Ex. 2, # 4 Exhibit 2nd Lynch CC Decl Ex. 3)(Briggs, Todd) (Filed on 10/8/2014)
September 26, 2014 101 Order by Hon. William H. Orrick granting 89 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Wendy E. Miller. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2014)
September 26, 2014 100 Order by Hon. William H. Orrick granting 90 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Arthur J. Steiner. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2014)
September 26, 2014 99 Order by Hon. William H. Orrick granting 94 Motion for Pro Hac Vice of Aaron P. Selikson. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2014)
September 24, 2014 98 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Typo Products LLC for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Miller, Wendy) (Filed on 9/24/2014)
September 23, 2014 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Per 97 Order, Typo shall serve a reduced list of disputed terms for construction on 10/1/2014. Blackberry shall filing its opening claim construction brief 10/8/2014. Typo shall file its response by 10/22/2014. Blackberry's reply is due 10/29/2014. Tutorial Hearing set for 11/7/2014 09:00 AM and Claims Construction Hearing set for 11/14/2014 09:00 AM, both in Courtroom 12, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2014)
September 18, 2014 97 Featured Case ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM CLAIM CONSTRUCTION SCHEDULE by Hon. William H. Orrick denying 92 Ex Parte Application. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2014)
September 17, 2014 96 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION STATEMENT BlackBerry Opening Claim Construction Brief filed by BlackBerry Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Lynch Declaration in support of BlackBerry's Opening Claim Construction Brief, # 2 Exhibit Lynch Ex. 1, # 3 Exhibit Lynch Ex. 2, # 4 Exhibit Lynch Ex. 3, # 5 Exhibit Lynch Ex. 4, # 6 Exhibit Lynch Ex. 5, # 7 Exhibit Lynch Ex. 6, # 8 Exhibit Lynch Ex. 7)(Briggs, Todd) (Filed on 9/17/2014)
September 15, 2014 95 RESPONSE (re 92 Ex Parte Application for Relief from Claim Construction Schedule Pursuant to L.R. 7-11 ) filed byBlackBerry Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Johnson, Kevin) (Filed on 9/15/2014)
September 12, 2014 94 MOTION & [PROPOSED] ORDER for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice by Aaron P. Selikson ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-8916522.) filed by Typo Products LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Selikson, Aaron) (Filed on 9/12/2014) Modified on 9/15/2014 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
September 12, 2014 93 EXHIBITS re 92 Ex Parte Application for Relief from Claim Construction Schedule Pursuant to L.R. 7-11 Corrected Exh. A to Miller Decl. filed byTypo Products LLC. (Related document(s) 92 ) (Cialone, Frank) (Filed on 9/12/2014)
September 11, 2014 92 Ex Parte Application for Relief from Claim Construction Schedule Pursuant to L.R. 7-11 filed by Typo Products LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Declaration of Wendy E. Miller, # 2 Proposed Order)(Cialone, Frank) (Filed on 9/11/2014)
September 10, 2014 91 NOTICE of Appearance by Frank A. Cialone (Cialone, Frank) (Filed on 9/10/2014)
September 10, 2014 90 MOTION & [PROPOSED] ORDER for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice by Arthur J. Steiner ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-8908423.) filed by Typo Products LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Steiner, Arthur) (Filed on 9/10/2014) Modified on 9/11/2014 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
September 10, 2014 89 MOTION & [PROPOSED] ORDER for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice by Wendy E. Miller ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-8908405.) filed by Typo Products LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Miller, Wendy) (Filed on 9/10/2014) Modified on 9/11/2014 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
September 3, 2014 88 Transcript of Proceedings of the official sound recording held on 08/20/14, before Judge William Orrick. FTR/Transcriber Echo Reporting; Tara Bauer, Telephone number (858) 453-7590; echoreporting@yahoo.com. Tape Number: FTR 2:59 - 3:31. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re 85 Transcript Order ) Redaction Request due 9/24/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/6/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/2/2014. (Related documents(s) 85 ) (tgb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2014)
August 21, 2014 87 Featured Case ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR RELIEF PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 60(b); ORDERING LIMITED DISCOVERY REGARDING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY DEFENDANT SHOULD NOT BE HELD IN CONTEMPT by Judge William H. Orrick denying 70 Motion for Relief Pursuant to 60(b); granting in part and denying in part 73 Motion for Order to Show Cause. Blackberry is authorized to take discovery in connection with its motion for an order to show cause. Blackberry may re-notice its motion at its convenience once the discovery is completed. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2014)
August 20, 2014 86 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 8/20/2014 before William H. Orrick re 70 MOTION for Relief Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 60(B)and 73 MOTION for Order to Show Cause Why Typo Products Should Not Be Held In Contempt Of The Preliminary Injunction Order. Motions taken under submission; written order to follow. (Court Reporter FTR 2:59-3:31) (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/20/2014)
August 20, 2014 85 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by BlackBerry Limited for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Briggs, Todd) (Filed on 8/20/2014)
August 14, 2014 84 NOTICE of Appearance by Todd Michael Briggs (Briggs, Todd) (Filed on 8/14/2014)
August 13, 2014 83 REPLY (re 73 MOTION for Order to Show Cause Why Typo Products Should Not Be Held In Contempt Of The Preliminary Injunction Order ) filed byBlackBerry Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Bramhall Declaration ISO Of Blackberrys Reply ISO Its Motion To Show Cause, # 2 Exhibit Bramhall Declaration Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit Bramhall Declaration Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit Bramhall Declaration Exhibit 3)(Johnson, Kevin) (Filed on 8/13/2014)
August 6, 2014 82 NOTICE by Typo Products LLC re 81 Opposition/Response to Motion,, (Notice of Lodging Exhibit) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Taillieu, Olivier) (Filed on 8/6/2014)
August 6, 2014 81 RESPONSE (re 73 MOTION for Order to Show Cause Why Typo Products Should Not Be Held In Contempt Of The Preliminary Injunction Order ) filed byTypo Products LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Laurence Hallier, # 2 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Laurence Hallier, # 3 Exhibit 2 to Declaration of Laurence Hallier, # 4 Exhibit 3 to Declaration of Laurence Hallier, # 5 Exhibit 4 to Declaration of Laurence Hallier, # 6 Exhibit 5 to Declaration of Laurence Hallier, # 7 Declaration of Olivier Taillieu, # 8 Exhibit A to Declaration of Olivier Taillieu)(Taillieu, Olivier) (Filed on 8/6/2014)
August 4, 2014 80 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION STATEMENT Under Patent Local Rule 4-3 filed by BlackBerry Limited. (Johnson, Kevin) (Filed on 8/4/2014)
July 31, 2014 79 NOTICE of Appearance by Brice Clark Lynch (Lynch, Brice) (Filed on 7/31/2014)
July 31, 2014 78 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Jonathan Bramhall (Bramhall, Andrew) (Filed on 7/31/2014)
July 25, 2014 77 CLERKS NOTICE - Reset Deadlines as to 70 MOTION for Relief Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 60(B). Motion Hearing rescheduled for 8/20/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William H. Orrick. (Hearing 8/6/2014 is VACATED.) This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associaed with this noice. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2014)
July 25, 2014 Set/Reset Deadlines as to 73 MOTION for Order to Show Cause. Responses due by 8/6/2014. Replies due by 8/13/2014. Motion Hearing set for 8/20/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William H. Orrick. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2014)
July 25, 2014 76 Featured Case ORDER REGARDING BLACKBERRY'S 74 MOTION TO SHORTEN TIME by Hon. William H. Orrick. Typo's opposition brief is due August 6, 2014; BlackBerry's reply brief is due August 13, 2014; and The Court sets a hearing on Wednesday, August 20, 2014, at 2 p.m. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2014)
July 24, 2014 75 RESPONSE (re 74 MOTION to Shorten Time For Briefing And Hearing On BlackBerry's Motion For An Order To Show Cause ) filed byTypo Products LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Olivier Taillieu, # 2 Exhibit A-C)(Taillieu, Olivier) (Filed on 7/24/2014)
July 23, 2014 74 MOTION to Shorten Time For Briefing And Hearing On BlackBerry's Motion For An Order To Show Cause filed by BlackBerry Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Proposed Order)(Johnson, Kevin) (Filed on 7/23/2014)
July 23, 2014 73 MOTION for Order to Show Cause Why Typo Products Should Not Be Held In Contempt Of The Preliminary Injunction Order filed by BlackBerry Limited. Motion Hearing set for 9/10/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William H. Orrick. Responses due by 8/6/2014. Replies due by 8/13/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Arnold Declaration, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Bramhall Declaration, # 13 Exhibit 1, # 14 Exhibit 2, # 15 Proposed Order)(Johnson, Kevin) (Filed on 7/23/2014)
June 27, 2014 72 ANSWER TO COUNTERCLAIM 69 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim byBlackBerry Limited. (Johnson, Kevin) (Filed on 6/27/2014)
June 25, 2014 71 RESPONSE (re 70 MOTION for Relief Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 60(B) ) filed byBlackBerry Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Bramhall Declaration ISO BlackBerry Opposition To Typo Rule 60(b) Motion, # 2 Exhibit Bramhall Declaration Ex. 1, # 3 Exhibit Bramhall Declaration Ex. 2, # 4 Exhibit Bramhall Declaration Ex. 3, # 5 Exhibit Bramhall Declaration Ex. 4, # 6 Exhibit Bramhall Declaration Ex. 5, # 7 Exhibit Bramhall Declaration Ex. 6, # 8 Exhibit Bramhall Declaration Ex. 7, # 9 Exhibit Bramhall Declaration Ex. 8)(Johnson, Kevin) (Filed on 6/25/2014)
June 11, 2014 70 MOTION for Relief Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 60(B) filed by Typo Products LLC. Motion Hearing set for 8/6/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William H. Orrick. Responses due by 6/25/2014. Replies due by 7/2/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Laurence Hallier, # 2 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Laurence Hallier, # 3 Exhibit 2 to Declaration of Laurence Hallier, # 4 Declaration of Olivier Taillieu, # 5 Exhibit A to Declaration of Olivier Taillieu, # 6 Proposed Order)(Taillieu, Olivier) (Filed on 6/11/2014)
June 6, 2014 69 Amended 26 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand and, COUNTERCLAIM against BlackBerry Limited byTypo Products LLC. (Taillieu, Olivier) (Filed on 6/6/2014) Modified on 6/9/2014 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
May 30, 2014 68 Featured Case ORDER by Judge William H. Orrick granting 48 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal and 51 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/30/2014)
May 20, 2014 67 Minute Entry: Settlement Conference Held. (Date Filed: 5/20/2014). Matter did not settle. (Court Reporter: Not reported.) (fs, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/20/2014)
May 16, 2014 66 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Taillieu, Olivier) (Filed on 5/16/2014)
May 8, 2014 65 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S 30 MOTION TO STRIKE AND DISMISS COUNTERCLAIM AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES by Hon. William H. Orrick. Typo's inequitable conduct counterclaim and affirmative defense are DISMISSED. Typo's affirmative defenses for prosecution history estoppel (eleventh affirmative defense), equitable estoppel (twelfth), patent misuse (thirteenth), abandonment (twentieth), and comparative negligence (twenty-first) are STRUCK. Typo is granted LEAVE TO FILE AN AMENDED ANSWER AND COUNTERCLAIM within 30 days of this order. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2014)
May 7, 2014 64 Order Rescheduling Settlement Conference before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Settlement Conference set for 5/20/2014 11:00 AM. Signed by Judge Donna M. Ryu on 5/7/14. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2014)
May 2, 2014 63 COMPLAINT CORRECTION OF DOCKET # 1 against Typo Products LLC. Filed byBlackBerry Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet CORRECTION OF DOCKET # 1-4)(Johnson, Kevin) (Filed on 5/2/2014) Modified on 5/5/2014 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
May 1, 2014 Set/Reset Hearing Settlement Conference set for 5/23/2014 11:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor, Oakland. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2014)
May 1, 2014 62 Order Setting Settlement Conference before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Settlement Conference set for 5/23/2014 11:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor, Oakland.. Signed by Judge Donna M. Ryu on 5/1/14. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2014) Modified on 5/1/2014 (jjoS, COURT STAFF).
April 30, 2014 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu for Settlement (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2014)
April 30, 2014 61 Featured Case ORDER OF REFERENCE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on April 30, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2014).
April 30, 2014 60 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 4/30/2014 before Judge William H. Orrick (Date Filed: 4/30/2014) re 30 MOTION to Dismiss filed by BlackBerry Limited. Case Management Conference held on 4/30/2014 before Judge William H. Orrick (Date Filed: 4/30/2014). Tutorial Hearing set for 10/22/2014 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Claims Construction Hearing set for 10/31/2014 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (FTR Recording: 9:26-9:31 a.m.) (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/30/2014)
April 28, 2014 ADR Remark: ADR Phone Conference held by Daniel Bowling, ADR Program Staff Attorney, on 4/28/2014. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2014)
April 28, 2014 59 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options by BlackBerry Limited and Counsel for BlackBerry Limited (Bedecarre, Albert) (Filed on 4/28/2014)
April 28, 2014 58 NOTICE of Appearance by Albert P. Bedecarre for BlackBerry Limited (Bedecarre, Albert) (Filed on 4/28/2014)
April 25, 2014 57 ADR Clerks Notice Setting ADR Phone Conference on Monday, April 28, 2014 at 2:00 PM Pacific time. Please note that you must be logged into an ECF account of counsel of record in order to view this document. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2014)
April 22, 2014 56 NOTICE of need for ADR Phone Conference (ADR L.R. 3-5 d) (Taillieu, Olivier) (Filed on 4/22/2014)
April 15, 2014 55 NOTICE by BlackBerry Limited re 54 Preliminary Injunction Bond Pursuant to Order Setting Bond for Issuance of Preliminary Injunction (Johnson, Kevin) (Filed on 4/15/2014)
April 11, 2014 54 Order regarding amount of bond, PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. Signed by Judge Willaim H. Orrick on April 11, 2014. (wholc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2014)
April 11, 2014 53 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by BlackBerry Limited re 51 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal BlackBerry's Responsive Brief Regarding Bonding (Johnson, Kevin) (Filed on 4/11/2014)
April 11, 2014 52 Declaration of Brice C. Lynch in Support of BlackBerry Limited's Responsive Brief Regarding Rule 65(c) filed byBlackBerry Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6)(Johnson, Kevin) (Filed on 4/11/2014)
April 11, 2014 51 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal BlackBerry's Responsive Brief Regarding Bonding filed by BlackBerry Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Brice C. Lynch in Support of Administrative Motion to Seal, # 2 Proposed Order Granting Administrative Motion to Seal, # 3 Redacted Version of BlackBerry Limited's Responsive Brief Regarding Bonding Under Rule 65(c), # 4 Unredacted Version of BlackBerry Limited's Responsive Brief Regarding Bonding Under Rule 62(c), # 5 Unredacted and Unhighlighted Version of BlackBerry Limited's Responsive Brief Regarding Bonding Under Rule 62(c))(Johnson, Kevin) (Filed on 4/11/2014)
April 8, 2014 50 CLERKS NOTICE - Hearing as to 30 MOTION to Dismiss and Case Management Conference RESCHDULED for 4/30/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco, before Hon. William H. Orrick. (Hearning and CMC set for 4/9/2014 VACATED.) This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2014)
April 4, 2014 49 NOTICE by Typo Products LLC re 48 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Notice of Errata) (Attachments: # 1 Typo's Brief RE Calculation of an Appropriate Bond Under Rule 65(C) - Redacted)(Taillieu, Olivier) (Filed on 4/4/2014)
April 4, 2014 48 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Typo Products LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Olivier Taillieu, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Typo's Brief Re Calculation of an Appropriate Bond Under Rule 65(C) - Redacted, # 4 Declaration of Laurence Hallier - Redacted, # 5 Typo's Brief Re Calculation of an Appropriate Bond Under Rule 65(C) - Original, # 6 Declaration of Laurence Hallier - Original)(Taillieu, Olivier) (Filed on 4/4/2014) Modified on 4/7/2014 to seal document 48-3, which failed to fully redact all confidential information; the document has been refiled at Dkt. No. 49 (jmdS, COURT STAFF).
April 4, 2014 47 Notice of Withdrawal of 41 Motion to Stay and Suspend the March 28, 2014 Preliminary Injunction Pending Appeal or, Alternatively, Pending Decision by Federal Circuit on Stay Pending Appeal (Taillieu, Olivier) (Filed on 4/4/2014) Modified on 4/7/2014 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
April 2, 2014 46 Order by Hon. William H. Orrick granting 44 Stipulation to Shorten Time. BlackBerry shall file its opposition to 41 Motion on or before April 4, 2014; Typo shall not file a reply to BlackBerry's opposition. The Court shall hear argument on the Motion on April 9, 2004, at 2:00 p.m. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2014)
April 1, 2014 45 Certificate of Interested Entities by Typo Products LLC Typo Products LLC's FRCP 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Taillieu, Olivier) (Filed on 4/1/2014)
April 1, 2014 44 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 41 MOTION to Stay and Suspend the March 28, 2014 Preliminary Injunction Pending Appeal or, Alternatively, Pending Decision by Federal Circuit on Stay Pending Appeal filed by Typo Products LLC. (Taillieu, Olivier) (Filed on 4/1/2014)
April 1, 2014 43 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by BlackBerry Limited. (Johnson, Kevin) (Filed on 4/1/2014)
April 1, 2014 42 REPLY (re 30 MOTION to Dismiss ) filed byBlackBerry Limited. (Johnson, Kevin) (Filed on 4/1/2014)
March 31, 2014 41 MOTION to Stay and Suspend the March 28, 2014 Preliminary Injunction Pending Appeal or, Alternatively, Pending Decision by Federal Circuit on Stay Pending Appeal filed by Typo Products LLC. Responses due by 4/14/2014. Replies due by 4/21/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Taillieu, Olivier) (Filed on 3/31/2014)
March 31, 2014 40 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th CCA Typo Products LLC. Appeal of Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction, re 39 Order; (Pay.gov Agency Tracking ID 25F2V05O.) (Attachments: # 1 March 28, 2014 Order)(Taillieu, Olivier) (Filed on 3/31/2014) Modified on 4/1/2014 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
March 28, 2014 39 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING BLACKBERRY'S MOTION FOR A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION by Judge William H. Orrick granting 11 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal and granting 12 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Typo shall submit evidence concerning the proper amount of bond within seven days of this order. BlackBerry shall submit a response concerning the proper amount of bond seven days thereafter. Neither party's brief shall exceed five pages in length. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2014)
March 28, 2014 38 ADR Clerks Notice re: Non-Compliance with Court Order. (tjs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2014)
March 26, 2014 37 CLERKS NOTICE - Case Management Conference rescheduled to follow motion hearing set for 4/9/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (CMC set 4/8/2014 is VACATED.) This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2014)
March 25, 2014 36 RESPONSE (re 30 MOTION to Dismiss ) filed byTypo Products LLC. (Taillieu, Olivier) (Filed on 3/25/2014)
March 24, 2014 35 Transcript of Proceedings held on 3/21/2014, before Judge William H. Orrick. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lydia Zinn, Telephone number (415) 531-6587. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/23/2014. (Related documents(s) 34 ) (Zinn, Lydia) (Filed on 3/24/2014)
March 24, 2014 34 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by BlackBerry Limited for Court Reporter Lydia Zinn. (Johnson, Kevin) (Filed on 3/24/2014)
March 21, 2014 33 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 3/21/2014 before William H. Orrick re 12 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by BlackBerry Limited. (Court Reporter Lydia Zinn.) (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/21/2014)
March 11, 2014 32 Certificate of Interested Entities by BlackBerry Limited BlackBerry Limited's FRCP 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Johnson, Kevin) (Filed on 3/11/2014)
March 11, 2014 31 Certificate of Interested Entities by BlackBerry Limited (Johnson, Kevin) (Filed on 3/11/2014)
March 11, 2014 30 MOTION to Dismiss filed by BlackBerry Limited. Motion Hearing set for 4/9/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William H. Orrick. Responses due by 3/25/2014. Replies due by 4/1/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Strike Typo Products LLC's Tenth, Eleventh, Twelfth, Thirteenth, Twentieth, and Twenty-First Affirmative Defenses and Dismiss Typo Product LLC's Seventh Counterclaim Contained in Typo Product LLC's Answer to Blackberry Limited's Complaint)(Johnson, Kevin) (Filed on 3/11/2014)
March 3, 2014 29 Order by Hon. William H. Orrick granting 28 Motion to Permit Counsel to Bring Electronic Equipment into the Courtroom. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2014)
March 3, 2014 Set/Reset Deadlines as to 12 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. Motion Hearing reset for 3/21/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 12, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William H. Orrick. This motion is removed from the regular law and motion calendar on 3/19/2014 and specially set to allow aditional time; the location is also changed to allow for use of electronic evidence presentation equipment. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2014)
February 28, 2014 28 Joint MOTION for Order Permitting Counsel to Bring Electronic Equipment Into the Courtroom Pursuant to Civil L.R. 7-11 filed by BlackBerry Limited. Responses due by 3/14/2014. Replies due by 3/21/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Joint Administrative Motion for Order Permitting Counsel to Bring Electronic Equipment Into the Courtroom)(Johnson, Kevin) (Filed on 2/28/2014)
February 18, 2014 27 ANSWER to 1 Complaint with JURY DEMAND , COUNTERCLAIM against BlackBerry Limited byTypo Products LLC. (Taillieu, Olivier) (Filed on 2/18/2014) Modified on 2/19/2014 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
February 12, 2014 26 REPLY (re 12 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction ) filed byBlackBerry Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of David Rempel, # 2 Declaration of Samuel Lucente, # 3 Exhibit Lucente Ex. 1, # 4 Declaration of Brice Lynch, # 5 Exhibit Lynch Ex. 1, # 6 Exhibit Lynch Ex. 2, # 7 Exhibit Lynch Ex. 3, # 8 Exhibit Lynch Ex. 4, # 9 Exhibit Lynch Ex. 5, # 10 Exhibit Lynch Ex. 6, # 11 Exhibit Lynch Ex. 7, # 12 Exhibit Lynch Ex. 8)(Johnson, Kevin) (Filed on 2/12/2014)
February 6, 2014 Set/Reset Deadlines as to 12 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. Motion Hearing set for 3/19/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William H. Orrick. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2014)
February 5, 2014 25 RESPONSE (re 12 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction ) filed byTypo Products LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Charles M. Curley, # 2 Exhibit A to Curley Declaration, # 3 Exhibit 1-4 to Curley Declaration, # 4 Exhibit 5-8 to Curley Declaration, # 5 Exhibit 9-12 to Curley Declaration, # 6 Exhibit 13-16 to Curley Declaration, # 7 Exhibit 17-20 to Curley Declaration, # 8 Exhibit 21-Part 1 to Curley Declaration, # 9 Exhibit 21-Part 2 to Curley Declaration, # 10 Exhibit 21-Part 3 to Curley Declaration, # 11 Exhibit 27-29 to Curley Declaration, # 12 Exhibit 30-34 to Curley Declaration, # 13 Declaration of Jacob O. Wobbrock, Ph.D., # 14 Exhibit 1-Part1 to Wobbrock Declaration, # 15 Exhibit 1-Part 2 to Wobbrock Declaration, # 16 Exhibit 1-Part 3 to Wobbrock Declaration, # 17 Exhibit 1-Part 4 to Wobbrock Declaration, # 18 Exhibit 2-Part 1 to Wobbrock Declaration, # 19 Exhibit 2-Part 2 to Wobbrock Declaration, # 20 Exhibit 2-Part 3 to Wobbrock Declaration, # 21 Exhibit 2-Part 4 to Wobbrock Declaration, # 22 Declaration of Laurence Hallier, # 23 Exhibit 1-3 to Hallier Declaration, # 24 Exhibit 4-5 to Hallier Declaration, # 25 Exhibit 6-7 to Hallier Declaration, # 26 Exhibit 8 to Hallier Declaration, # 27 Exhibit 9-Part 1 to Hallier Declaration, # 28 Exhibit 9-Part 2 to Hallier Declaration, # 29 Exhibit 10 to Hallier Declaration, # 30 Exhibit 11-Part 1 to Hallier Declaration, # 31 Exhibit 11-Part 2 to Hallier Declaration, # 32 Exhibit 11-Part 3 to Hallier Declaration, # 33 Exhibit 12-Part 1 to Hallier Declaration, # 34 Exhibit 12-Part 2 to Hallier Declaration, # 35 Exhibit 12-Part 3 to Hallier Declaration, # 36 Exhibit 12-Part 4 to Hallier Declaration, # 37 Exhibit 12-Part 5 to Hallier Declaration, # 38 Exhibit 12-Part 6 to Hallier Declaration, # 39 Exhibit 12-Part 7 to Hallier Declaration, # 40 Exhibit 12-Part 8 to Hallier Declaration, # 41 Exhibit 13 to Hallier Declaration, # 42 Exhibit 14-16 to Hallier Declaration, # 43 Exhibit 17-Part 1 to Hallier Declaration, # 44 Exhibit 17-Part 2 to Hallier Declaration, # 45 Exhibit 18-Part 1 to Hallier Declaration, # 46 Exhibit 18-Part 2 to Hallier Declaration, # 47 Exhibit 18-Part 3 to Hallier Declaration, # 48 Exhibit 18-Part 4 to Hallier Declaration, # 49 Declaration of Olivier A. Taillieu, # 50 Exhibit 1-Part 1 to Taillieu Declaration, # 51 Exhibit 1-Part 2 to Taillieu Declaration, # 52 Exhibit 2-Part 1 to Taillieu Declaration, # 53 Exhibit 2-Part 2 to Taillieu Declaration, # 54 Exhibit 3-Part 1 to Taillieu Declaration, # 55 Exhibit 3-Part 2 to Taillieu Declaration, # 56 Exhibit 4-Part 1 to Taillieu Declaration, # 57 Exhibit 4-Part 2 to Taillieu Declaration, # 58 Exhibit 5-Part 1 to Taillieu Declaration, # 59 Exhibit 5-Part 2 to Taillieu Declaration, # 60 Exhibit 5-Part 3 to Taillieu Declaration, # 61 Exhibit 5-Part 4 to Taillieu Declaration, # 62 Exhibit 5-Part 5 to Taillieu Declaration, # 63 Exhibit 5-Part 6 to Taillieu Declaration, # 64 Exhibit 5-Part 7 to Taillieu Declaration, # 65 Exhibit 5-Part 8 to Taillieu Declaration, # 66 Exhibit 5-Part 9 to Taillieu Declaration, # 67 Exhibit 5-Part 10 to Taillieu Declaration, # 68 Exhibit 5-Part 11 to Taillieu Declaration, # 69 Exhibit 6-Part 1 to Taillieu Declaration, # 70 Exhibit 6-Part 2 to Taillieu Declaration, # 71 Exhibit 6-Part 3 to Taillieu Declaration, # 72 Exhibit 6-Part 4 to Taillieu Declaration, # 73 Exhibit 6-Part 5 to Taillieu Declaration, # 74 Exhibit 6-Part 6 to Taillieu Declaration, # 75 Exhibit 6-Part 7 to Taillieu Declaration, # 76 Exhibit 6-Part 8 to Taillieu Declaration, # 77 Exhibit 6-Part 9 to Taillieu Declaration, # 78 Exhibit 7-8 to Taillieu Declaration)(Taillieu, Olivier) (Filed on 2/5/2014)
February 4, 2014 24 NOTICE by BlackBerry Limited re 12 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Blackberry Limited's Notice Continuing Hearing Date to 3/19/2014 at 2:00 p.m. (Johnson, Kevin) (Filed on 2/4/2014) Modified on 2/6/2014 to add date and time of hearing (jmdS, COURT STAFF).
January 30, 2014 23 STIPULATION re 15 Certificate of Service filed by Typo Products LLC. (Zerounian, Raffi) (Filed on 1/30/2014)
January 27, 2014 22 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by BlackBerry Limited re 12 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Blackberry Limited's Proof of Service of Documents Served on Typo Products LLC Related to Blackberry's Motion for a Preliminary Injunction [D.N. 12] (Johnson, Kevin) (Filed on 1/27/2014)
January 27, 2014 21 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by BlackBerry Limited re 1 Complaint, Blackberry Limited's Proof of Service of Documents Served on Typo Products LLC Related to Blackberry's Administrative Motion to Seal (D.N. 11] (Johnson, Kevin) (Filed on 1/27/2014)
January 23, 2014 20 EXHIBIT 48 TO THE DECLARATION OF BRICE LYNCH: VIDEO FILE; re 13 Part 48 Notice of Manual Filing ; filed byBlackBerry Limited. (Related document(s) 13 ) (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2014)
January 23, 2014 19 EXHIBIT 47 TO THE DECLARATION OF BRICE LYNCH: VIDEO FILE; re 13 Part 47 Notice of Manual Filing; filed byBlackBerry Limited. (Related document(s) 13 ) (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2014)
January 23, 2014 18 EXHIBIT 3 TO THE DECLARATION OF BRICE LYNCH: FILE HISTORY OF PAT. APPL. 11-740,801 (964 PATENT: re 13 Part 3 Notice of Manual Filing; BlackBerry Limited. (Related document(s) 13 ) (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2014)
January 23, 2014 17 EXHIBIT 4 TO THE DECLARATION OF WILLIAM DOUGLAS: VIDEO FILE; re 12 Part 14 Notice of Manual Filing ; filed byBlackBerry Limited. (Related document(s) 12 ) (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2014)
January 23, 2014 16 EXHIBIT 3 TO THE DECLARATION OF SAM LUCENTE: VIDEO FILE; re 12 Part 8 Notice of Manual Filing filed byBlackBerry Limited. (Related document(s) 12 ) (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2014)
January 23, 2014 15 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by BlackBerry Limited re 1 Complaint, Proof of Service (Johnson, Kevin) (Filed on 1/23/2014)
January 23, 2014 Set/Reset Deadlines as to 12 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . Motion Hearing set for 3/5/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William H. Orrick. (Correcting time of hearing, which was originally indicated as 9:30 a.m.) (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2014)
January 22, 2014 14 Declaration of David Rempel in Support of 12 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed byBlackBerry Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Rempel Declaration Exhibit 1 Filed Under Seal, # 2 Exhibit Rempel Declaration Exhibit 2 Filed Under Seal, # 3 Exhibit Rempel Declaration Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit Rempel Declaration Exhibit 4)(Related document(s) 12 ) (Johnson, Kevin) (Filed on 1/22/2014)
January 22, 2014 13 Declaration of Brice C. Lynch in Support of 12 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed byBlackBerry Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Lynch Declaration Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit Lynch Declaration Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit Lynch Declaration Exhibit 3 Manual Filing Notice, # 4 Exhibit Lynch Declaration Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit Lynch Declaration Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit Lynch Declaration Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit Lynch Declaration Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit Lynch Declaration Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit Lynch Declaration Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit Lynch Declaration Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit Lynch Declaration Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit Lynch Declaration Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit Lynch Declaration Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit Lynch Declaration Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit Lynch Declaration Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit Lynch Declaration Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit Lynch Declaration Exhibit 17, # 18 Exhibit Lynch Declaration Exhibit 18, # 19 Exhibit Lynch Declaration Exhibit 19, # 20 Exhibit Lynch Declaration Exhibit 20, # 21 Exhibit Lynch Declaration Exhibit 21, # 22 Exhibit Lynch Declaration Exhibit 22, # 23 Exhibit Lynch Declaration Exhibit 23, # 24 Exhibit Lynch Declaration Exhibit 24, # 25 Exhibit Lynch Declaration Exhibit 25, # 26 Exhibit Lynch Declaration Exhibit 26, # 27 Exhibit Lynch Declaration Exhibit 27, # 28 Exhibit Lynch Declaration Exhibit 28, # 29 Exhibit Lynch Declaration Exhibit 29, # 30 Exhibit Lynch Declaration Exhibit 30, # 31 Exhibit Lynch Declaration Exhibit 31, # 32 Exhibit Lynch Declaration Exhibit 32, # 33 Exhibit Lynch Declaration Exhibit 33, # 34 Exhibit Lynch Declaration Exhibit 34, # 35 Exhibit Lynch Declaration Exhibit 35, # 36 Exhibit Lynch Declaration Exhibit 36, # 37 Exhibit Lynch Declaration Exhibit 37, # 38 Exhibit Lynch Declaration Exhibit 38, # 39 Exhibit Lynch Declaration Exhibit 39, # 40 Exhibit Lynch Declaration Exhibit 40, # 41 Exhibit Lynch Declaration Exhibit 41, # 42 Exhibit Lynch Declaration Exhibit 42, # 43 Exhibit Lynch Declaration Exhibit 43, # 44 Exhibit Lynch Declaration Exhibit 44, # 45 Exhibit Lynch Declaration Exhibit 45, # 46 Exhibit Lynch Declaration Exhibit 46, # 47 Exhibit Lynch Declaration Exhibit 47 Manual Filing Notice, # 48 Exhibit Lynch Declaration Exhibit 48 Manual Filing Notice, # 49 Exhibit Lynch Declaration Exhibit 49, # 50 Exhibit Lynch Declaration Exhibit 50)(Related document(s) 12 ) (Johnson, Kevin) (Filed on 1/22/2014)
January 22, 2014 12 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by BlackBerry Limited. Motion Hearing set for 3/5/2014 09:30 AM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William H. Orrick. Responses due by 2/5/2014. Replies due by 2/12/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Preliminary Injunction, # 2 Declaration Hofer Declaration ISO PI Motion, # 3 Exhibit Hofer Declaration Exhibit 1, # 4 Exhibit Hofer Declaration Exhibit 2, # 5 Declaration Lucente Declaration ISO PI Motion, # 6 Exhibit Lucente Declaration Exhibit 1, # 7 Exhibit Lucente Declaration Exhibit 2, # 8 Exhibit Lucente Declaration Exhibit 3 Manual Filing Notice, # 9 Exhibit Lucente Declaration Exhibit 4, # 10 Declaration Redacted Douglas Declaration ISO PI Motion, # 11 Exhibit Douglas Declaration Exhibit 1, # 12 Exhibit Douglas Declaration Exhibit 2, # 13 Exhibit Douglas Declaration Exhibit 3, # 14 Exhibit Douglas Declaration Exhibit 4 Manual Filing Notice, # 15 Exhibit Douglas Declaration Exhibit 5, # 16 Exhibit Douglas Declaration Exhibit 6, # 17 Exhibit Douglas Declaration Exhibit 7)(Johnson, Kevin) (Filed on 1/22/2014)
January 22, 2014 11 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by BlackBerry Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, # 2 Redacted Version of MOTION FOR A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT, # 3 Redacted Version of Douglas Declaration ISO PI Motion, # 4 Redacted Version of Rempel Declaration ISO PI Motion, # 5 Unredacted Version of MOTION FOR A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT, # 6 Unredacted Version of Douglas Declaration ISO PI Motion, # 7 Unredacted Version of Rempel Declaration ISO PI Motion, # 8 Unredacted Version of Rempel Declaration Exhibit 1, # 9 Unredacted Version of Rempel Declaration Exhibit 2, # 10 Declaration of Ray R. Zado in Support of Motion to Seal)(Johnson, Kevin) (Filed on 1/22/2014)
January 6, 2014 10 Featured Case CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER - Case Management Statement due by 4/1/2014. Case Management Conference set for 4/8/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 01/06/2014. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2014)
January 6, 2014 9 Featured Case ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Hon. William H. Orrick for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 1/6/14. (sv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2014)
January 6, 2014 8 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2014)
January 3, 2014 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by BlackBerry Limited.. (Johnson, Kevin) (Filed on 1/3/2014)
January 3, 2014 6 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding patent (cc: form mailed to register). (farS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2014)
January 3, 2014 5 Summons Issued as to Typo Products LLC. (farS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2014)
January 3, 2014 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 3/27/2014. Case Management Conference set for 4/3/2014 11:00 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order)(farS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2014)
January 3, 2014 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (tsh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2014)
January 3, 2014 2 Proposed Summons. (Johnson, Kevin) (Filed on 1/3/2014)
January 3, 2014 1 COMPLAINT against Typo Products LLC ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-8267949). DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL. Filed by BlackBerry Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit C, # 4 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, # 5 Report to PTO)(Johnson, Kevin) (Filed on 1/3/2014) Modified on 1/3/2014 (farS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: BlackBerry Limited v. Typo Products LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BlackBerry Limited
Represented By: Ray R. Zado(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Kevin P.B. Johnson
Represented By: James Robert Asperger(Designation Retained)
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Typo Products LLC
Represented By: Raffi Vaheh Zerounian
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]