Ortiz v. County of Sonoma et al

Defendant: Kenneth Sheets, Gregory Bones, Steve Freitas, County of Sonoma and Randolph Walker
Plaintiff: David Ortiz
 
Case Number: 3:2014cv00322
Filed: January 22, 2014
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Sonoma
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Scott Corley
 
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
April 4, 2014 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 8 Motion to Dismiss (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2014)
June 24, 2014 41 Opinion or Order of the Court CIVIL PRETRIAL ORDER: REFERRING CASE to Mediation, to be completed by 9/30/2014. Case Management Statement due by 10/23/2014. Discovery due by 10/24/2014. Expert Discovery due by 12/19/2014. Dispositive Motions due by 1/8/2015. Further Case Man agement Conference set for 10/30/2014 01:30 PM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Jury Selection / Jury Trial (7 days) set for 5/11/2015 08:30 AM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Dispositive Motion Hearing set for 2/9/2015 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley.. Signed by Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 6/24/2014. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2014)
June 25, 2014 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 32 Motion to Dismiss with leave to amend. (Corley, Jacqueline) (Filed on 6/25/2014)
September 2, 2014 55 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting in part and denying in part 45 Motion to Dismiss.(jsclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Ortiz v. County of Sonoma et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Sheets
Represented By: Lisa Ann Hilario
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory Bones
Represented By: Lisa Ann Hilario
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Freitas
Represented By: Lisa Ann Hilario
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Sonoma
Represented By: Gregory G. Spaulding(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Lisa Ann Hilario(Designation Retained)
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randolph Walker
Represented By: Lisa Ann Hilario
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Ortiz
Represented By: Carl B. Shapiro(Designation Retained)
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]