Dodge v. Author Solutions

Plaintiff: Gary Reginald Dodge
Defendant: Author Solutions
 
Case Number: 3:2014cv00518
Filed: February 3, 2014
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
 
Nature of Suit: Copyrights
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
March 5, 2014 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 10 11 12 PLAINTIFF'S REQUESTS FOR RELIEF. Signed by Judge Laurel Beeler on 3/5/2014. (lblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2014)
March 25, 2014 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING LEGAL HELP DESK, HANDBOOK FOR LITIGANTS WITHOUT A LAWYER, AND LEGAL STANDARDS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTIONS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 3/25/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service, # 2 Pro Se Help Desk Flyer, # 3 Pro Se Handbook)(ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2014)
April 10, 2014 24 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler granting 16 Motion to Dismiss.(lblc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2014)
June 9, 2014 31 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler granting 28 Motion to Dismiss.(lblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2014)
July 30, 2014 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING REQUEST FOR EXTENSION: Re 37 Opposition/Response to Motion filed by Gary Reginald Dodge. Opposition due August 6, 2014. Optional Reply due August 11, 2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 7/30/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2014)
August 11, 2014 41 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler granting 34 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings without leave to amend.(lblc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Dodge v. Author Solutions
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Reginald Dodge
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Author Solutions
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]