Quiroga v. Wells Fargo Financial Services, Inc et al

Defendant: NDEX West, LLC and Wells Fargo Financial Services, Inc
Plaintiff: John A. Quiroga
Case Number: 3:2014cv01332
Filed: March 21, 2014
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Kandis A. Westmore
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1444
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 25, 2014 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore denying 7 Motion to Remand (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2014)
May 27, 2014 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Referring Case to ADR Unit for Assessment Telephone Conference. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 5/27/2014. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2014)
August 11, 2014 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER terminating 8/21/2014 hearing on Wells Fargo's 13 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 8/11/2014. The Court will consider the matter submitted upon completion of the ADR process. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2014)
August 15, 2014 24 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE CMC re 23 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Continue CMC; and NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT filed by John A. Quiroga, Wells Fargo Financial Services, Inc Case Management Statement due by 10/28/2014. Case Management Conference set for 11/4/2014 01:30 PM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 8/15/14. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2014)
October 6, 2014 26 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 25 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. RULE 41(a) DISMISSING ACTION WITH PREJUDICE filed by John A. Quiroga, Wells Fargo Financial Services, Inc, ***Civil Case Terminated.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 10/6/14. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Quiroga v. Wells Fargo Financial Services, Inc et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NDEX West, LLC
Represented By: Masumi Jagdish Patel(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Edward A. Treder(Designation Retained)
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Financial Services, Inc
Represented By: Dong-Youl Dennis La
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John A. Quiroga
Represented By: Armine Singh(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Dianna Ter-Vardanyan(Designation Retained)
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]