Autodesk, Inc. v. ZWCAD Software Co., Ltd. et al

Plaintiff: Autodesk, Inc.
Defendant: ZWCAD Software Co., Ltd., ZWCAD Design Co., Ltd. and Global Force Direct, LLC
Case Number: 3:2014cv01409
Filed: March 26, 2014
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Marin
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth D. Laporte
Nature of Suit: Copyrights
Cause of Action: 28:1338
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 13, 2015 107 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 48 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 5/13/2015. (ejdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2015) Modified on 5/13/2015 (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF).
May 22, 2015 110 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING MOTION TO APPOINT NEUTRAL EXPERT OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER, GRANTING CROSS-MOTION TO COMPEL AND GRANTING-IN-PART MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION AND FOR INJUNCTIVE RELIEF by Judge Paul S. Grewal denying 82 ; granting 85 ; granting-in-part 87 (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2015)
July 3, 2014 31 Opinion or Order of the Court CASE MANAGEMENT AND PRETRIAL ORDER for Jury Trial by Chief Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte.(shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/3/2014)
December 18, 2014 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING re 49 Stipulation Extending Briefing Schedule filed by ZWCAD Design Co., Ltd., ZWCAD Software Co., Ltd. Set/Reset Deadlines as to 48 MOTION to Dismiss : Opposition due by 1/6/2015. Reply due by 1/13/2015. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 12/18/2014. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2014)
March 27, 2015 81 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING MOTION TO ADOPT THE HAGUE CONVENTION OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE TO MODIFY THE PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal denying 52 . (psglc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Autodesk, Inc. v. ZWCAD Software Co., Ltd. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Autodesk, Inc.
Represented By: Richard S.J. Hung(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Michael A. Jacobs(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ZWCAD Software Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ZWCAD Design Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Global Force Direct, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.