Dudley v. MetroPCS Communications, Inc. et al

Defendant: T-Mobile US, Inc., MetroPCS Wireless, Inc. and MetroPCS Communications, Inc.
Plaintiff: Mary Dudley
Case Number: 3:2014cv01802
Filed: April 18, 2014
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Solano
Presiding Judge: Vince Chhabria
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 16, 2014 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING MOTION TO RELATE CASES. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 5/16/14. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2014)
June 16, 2014 23 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND MODIFIED ORDER re 8 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint and to Strike the Class Allegations.Updated Case Management Statement which shall include a proposed trial date,pretrial schedule and discovery pl an due by 7/17/2014. Case Management Conference set for 7/24/2014 01:00 PM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Motion Hearing set for 7/24/2014 01:00 PM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Vince Chhabria. Please note the location of the hearing. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 6/16/2014. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2014)
August 8, 2014 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Vince Chhabria granting in part and denying in part 8 Motion to Dismiss; denying Motion to Strike (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2014)
October 14, 2014 40 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Hon. Vince Chhabria granting 38 Stipulation to Continue the Case Management Conference and Modify Briefing Deadlines..(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2014)
October 20, 2014 41 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Hon. Vince Chhabria granting 39 Stipulated Protective Order.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2014)
December 3, 2014 46 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Hon. Vince Chhabria granting 45 Stipulation to Extend Deadline for Settlement Conference.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dudley v. MetroPCS Communications, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T-Mobile US, Inc.
Represented By: Michael James Stortz(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Matthew Jacob Adler(Designation Retained)
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MetroPCS Wireless, Inc.
Represented By: Michael James Stortz(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Matthew Jacob Adler(Designation Retained)
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MetroPCS Communications, Inc.
Represented By: Michael James Stortz(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Matthew Jacob Adler(Designation Retained)
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Dudley
Represented By: Steven Gregory Tidrick(Designation Retained)
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]