Transamerica Life Insurance Company v. Jurin et al

Defendant: Gregory L. Jurin and James P. McCrea
Plaintiff: Transamerica Life Insurance Company
 
Case Number: 3:2014cv01881
Filed: April 23, 2014
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
 
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
July 16, 2014 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler denying 11 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. (lblc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2014)
October 6, 2014 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER (1) REGARDING DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION AND (2) CONTINUING THE OCTOBER 9, 2014 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Laurel Beeler on 10/6/2014. (lblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2014)
October 28, 2014 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR LEAVE TO FILE SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING REGARDING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS OR, ALTERNATIVELY, TO STAY THIS ACTION. Transamerica must file supplemental briefing by November 3, 2014. Mr. Jurin and Mr. Crea must file by November 10, 2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 10/28/2014.(lblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Transamerica Life Insurance Company v. Jurin et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory L. Jurin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James P. McCrea
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Transamerica Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Adrienne Clare Publicover(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Donald Patrick Sullivan(Designation Retained)
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]