Chapman et al v. Agri-Packing Supply, Inc.

Plaintiff: Shirley Chapman and Smart Degradable Americas Inc.
Defendant: Agri-Packing Supply, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2014cv02798
Filed: June 17, 2014
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: Copyrights
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 10, 2015 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE SEALED TRANSCRIPT in relation to 22 Settlement Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 2/10/15. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2015)
February 13, 2015 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF CONDITIONAL DISMISSAL. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James on 2/13/2015. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2015)
May 12, 2015 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James granting 27 Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chapman et al v. Agri-Packing Supply, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shirley Chapman
Represented By: Kenneth Leonard Wilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Smart Degradable Americas Inc.
Represented By: Kenneth Leonard Wilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Agri-Packing Supply, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.