Parnell Pharmaceuticals, Inc. v. Parnell, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Parnell Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Defendant: Parnell, Inc., Parnell Pharmaceuticals Holdings Ltd., Parnell Corporate Services U.S., Inc. and Parnell U.S. 1, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2014cv03158
Filed: July 11, 2014
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Marin
Presiding Judge: Edward J. Davila
Referring Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 8, 2014 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 17 Stipulation Extending Time to File Response/Answer filed by Parnell, Inc., Parnell U.S. 1, Inc., Parnell Corporate Services U.S., Inc., Parnell Pharmaceuticals Holdings Ltd. Response due 9/26/2014. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 9/8/2014. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2014)
October 27, 2014 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Court finds that a scheduling conference is premature at this time. Accordingly, the Case Management Conference set for 10/31/2014 is CONTINUED to 3/26/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Joint Case Management Statement due by 3/19/2015. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 10/27/2014. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2014)
March 20, 2015 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Having reviewed the parties' Joint Case Management Conference Statement filed on March 18, 2015 (Docket Item No. 46 ), the court has determined that a Case Management Conference is premature at thi s time. Accordingly, the Case Management Conference scheduled for March 26, 2015 is VACATED and will be re-set, if necessary, upon resolution of the pending Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 3/20/2015. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Parnell Pharmaceuticals, Inc. v. Parnell, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Parnell Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Rochelle D. Alpert(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Stephanie Lynn Hall
Represented By: Sharon R. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Parnell, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Parnell Pharmaceuticals Holdings Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Parnell Corporate Services U.S., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Parnell U.S. 1, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.