Hull v. UNUM Life Insurance Company of America

Defendant: UNUM Life Insurance Company of America
Plaintiff: Kirk Hull
Case Number: 3:2014cv03332
Filed: July 23, 2014
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Solano
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Scott Corley
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 24, 2014 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Jon S. Tigar. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 9/24/14. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2014)
October 29, 2014 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER APPROVING REQUEST TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE re 23 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Continue the Case Management Conference and Request for Telephonic Appearance filed by UNUM Life Insurance Company of America. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/12/2014 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on October 29, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2014)
November 12, 2014 28 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 25 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER for Protective Order Prohibiting Disclosure of Confidential Information and Materials filed by UNUM Life Insurance Company of America. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on November 12, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2014)
November 21, 2014 29 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 21 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Private ADR by Kirk Hull filed by Kirk Hull. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on November 21, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hull v. UNUM Life Insurance Company of America
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNUM Life Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Daniel William Maguire, Esq.(Designation Retained)
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kirk Hull
Represented By: Brent Dorian(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Glenn R. Kantor(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Alan Edward Kassan(Designation Retained)
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]