Heal the Bay Inc, et al v. Browner, et al

Plaintiff: Heal the Bay Inc and Santa Monica Baykeeper, Inc.
Defendant: Carol Browner, Felicia Marcus and United States Environmental Protection Agency
Case Number: 4:1998cv04825
Filed: December 17, 1998
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Los Angeles
Presiding Judge: Saundra Brown Armstrong
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 33:1365
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 2, 2010 43 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 25 CONSENT DECREE. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 9/1/10. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2010)
March 20, 2013 60 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG denying 49 Motion to Intervene; denying 59 Stipulation (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2013)
April 15, 2014 73 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong Granting 71 Motion to Relate Case to C 14-1392 PJH. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2014)
October 2, 2014 76 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE. Motions due by 10/14/2014; Responses due by 12/5/2014; Replies due by 12/29/2014; Motion Hearing set for 1/27/2015 01:00 PM before Hon. Saundra Brown Armstrong. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 10/2/2014. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Heal the Bay Inc, et al v. Browner, et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heal the Bay Inc
Represented By: Steven Eugene Fleischli
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Santa Monica Baykeeper, Inc.
Represented By: David S. Beckman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carol Browner
Represented By: Rochelle Leigh Russell
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Felicia Marcus
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Environmental Protection Agency
Represented By: Rochelle Leigh Russell
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]