CRS Recovery Inc et al v. Laxton et al

 
Case Number: 4:2006cv07093
Filed: November 15, 2006
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
Referring Judge: Edward M. Chen
Presiding Judge: Claudia Wilken
 
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1121 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
September 26, 2008 169 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken denying 137 Motion to Disqualify Counsel. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2008)
September 26, 2008 170 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken granting 118 Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 131 Defendants' Cross Motion for Summary Judgment; denying as moot 161 Ex Parte Application to Shorten Time for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2008)
October 6, 2008 173 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING TURNOVER ORDER AND PERMANENT INJUNCTION. Signed by Judge 10/6/08 on CLAUDIA WILKEN. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2008)
December 9, 2008 199 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken denying 184 Motion to Stay Pending Appeal (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2008)
May 26, 2010 208 Featured Case ORDER re 207 Granting Stipulation TO VACATE AND RESET CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOLLOWING REMAND. Case Management Conference set for 7/13/2010 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 5/26/2010. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2010)
July 14, 2010 211 Featured Case ORDER re 210 Notice and Concerning Discharge of Counsel for Defendants John Laxton and Northbay Real Estate, Inc. (cwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2010)
July 21, 2010 215 Featured Case ORDER re 213 Granting Stipulation re Withdrawal of Counsel for Defendants John Laxton & Northbay Real Estate Inc. Upon Relief by Client. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 7/21/2010. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2010)
August 10, 2010 218 Featured Case ORDER CONTINUING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman granting 216 Motion to Continue (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2010) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/10/2010: # 1 Proof of Service) (bzsec, COURT STAFF).
September 20, 2010 219 Featured Case ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT JOHN LAXTON'S Request to Continue Trial Date and Requiring Laxton's Participation in Proceedings. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 9/20/2010. CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE as to Laxton. (cwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2010)
November 15, 2010 227 Featured Case ORDER STAYING PROCEEDINGS AGAINST DEFENDANT JOHN LAXTON, DIRECTING PLAINTIFFS TO FILE MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT AGAINST DEFENDANT NORTH BAY REAL ESTATE AND GRANTING IN PART PLAINTIFFS 226 MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE Case Management Statement due by 2/8/2011. Case Management Conference set for 2/15/2011 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 11/15/2010. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2010)
January 6, 2011 238 Featured Case ORDER ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSING CASE. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 1/6/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2011) (Entered on 1/7/2011)
October 21, 2011 253 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING TRUSTEES 240 MOTION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT AND GRANTING PLAINTIFFS 251 MOTION TO SCHEDULE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 11/29/2011. Case Management Conference set for 12/6/2011 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 10/21/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2011)
December 14, 2011 258 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER re 257 Stipulation filed by Dale Mayberry, CRS Recovery Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 12/14/2011. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2011) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/14/2011: # 1 Proof of Service) (bzsec, COURT STAFF).
March 23, 2012 264 Featured Case ORDER REGARDING DEFENDANT NORTHBAY REAL ESTATE, INC.S 260 MOTION TO DISMISS. Motion Hearing set for 4/25/2012 02:00 PM before Hon. Claudia Wilken. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 3/23/2012. Motions due by 3/25/2012. Responses due by 3/28/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2012)
April 23, 2012 308 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken DENYING DEFENDANT NORTHBAY REAL ESTATE, INC.S 260 MOTION TO DISMISS. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2012)
April 30, 2012 317 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken ORDER ON 277 , 294 MOTIONS IN LIMINE. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2012)
May 4, 2012 323 Featured Case ORDER DENYING 260 DEFENDANT NORTHBAY REAL ESTATE INC.'S MOTION TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on May 4, 2012. (cwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2012)
May 14, 2012 343 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING PERMANENT INJUNCTION. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 5/14/2012. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2012)
January 10, 2013 396 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken DENYING 349 MOTION FOR JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW AND DENYING 387 MOTION TO MODIFY PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION OR REQUIRE AN ADDITIONAL BOND. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2013)
January 10, 2013 397 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken DENYING DEFENDANTS 371 MOTION OBJECTING TO THE CLERKS TAXATION OF COSTS Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: CRS Recovery Inc et al v. Laxton et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]