Xiaoning et al v. Yahoo! Inc, et al Featured Case

Plaintiff, a citizen and resident of China, advocated for democratic reform within the country. Plaintiff alleges that he was arrested, incarcerated and tortured after Defendants provided Chinese officials with access to his private e-mail records, copies of e-mail messages, e-mail addresses, user ID numbers and other identifying information.

Plaintiff: Yu Ling, Wang Xiaoning and Shi Tao
Defendant: Yahoo! Holdings (Hong Kong), Ltd. and Yahoo! Inc.
 
Case Number: 4:2007cv02151
Filed: April 18, 2007
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Claudia Wilken
 
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question: Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:
Date Filed#Document Text
November 28, 2007 115 Featured Case ORDER re 114 granting Joint Stipulation of Dismissal. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 11/28/07. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/28/2007)
November 13, 2007 114 Joint Stipulation of Dismissal by Yahoo! Inc.. (Petrocelli, Daniel) (Filed on 11/13/2007) Modified on 11/14/2007 (cp, COURT STAFF).
October 31, 2007 113 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken granting in part and denying in part 90 Motion for Initial and Jurisdiction Discovery; denying 107 as moot Motion for Administrative Relief re: New Authority Cited in Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Their Motion for Initial and Jurisdictional Discovery (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2007)
October 30, 2007 112 CLERK'S NOTICE TAKING MOTION UNDER SUBMISSION. 11/1/07 motion hearing and CMC vacated. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2007)
October 26, 2007 111 NOTICE by United States of America of its Potential Participation (Haas, Alexander) (Filed on 10/26/2007)
October 22, 2007 110 Memorandum in Opposition to Defendants' Rule 7-11 Supplemental Submission filed byWang Xiaoning, Shi Tao, Yu Ling. (Myers, Roger) (Filed on 10/22/2007)
October 22, 2007 109 Proposed Order re 107 MOTION Administrative Relief re: New Authority Cited in Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Their Motion for Initial and Jurisdictional Discovery by Yahoo! Inc.. (Petrocelli, Daniel) (Filed on 10/22/2007)
October 22, 2007 108 Declaration of Matthew T. Kline in Support of 107 MOTION Administrative Relief re: New Authority Cited in Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Their Motion for Initial and Jurisdictional Discovery filed byYahoo! Inc.. (Related document(s) 107 ) (Petrocelli, Daniel) (Filed on 10/22/2007)
October 22, 2007 107 MOTION Administrative Relief re: New Authority Cited in Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Their Motion for Initial and Jurisdictional Discovery filed by Yahoo! Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 11/1/2007 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland. (Petrocelli, Daniel) (Filed on 10/22/2007)
October 18, 2007 106 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Wang Xiaoning, Shi Tao, Yu Ling re 105 Reply to Opposition (Myers, Roger) (Filed on 10/18/2007)
October 18, 2007 105 Reply to Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Initial and Jurisdictional Discovery filed byWang Xiaoning, Shi Tao, Yu Ling. (Myers, Roger) (Filed on 10/18/2007)
October 11, 2007 104 Memorandum in Opposition re 90 MOTION to Initiate Initial and Jurisdictional Discovery filed byYahoo! Inc.. (Petrocelli, Daniel) (Filed on 10/11/2007)
September 28, 2007 103 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT AND REPORT PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 26(F) filed by Yahoo! Inc., Yahoo! Holdings (Hong Kong), Ltd., Wang Xiaoning, Shi Tao, Yu Ling. (Kennedy, Colleen) (Filed on 9/28/2007)
September 26, 2007 102 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5b) of discussion of ADR options filed by Plaintiffs Yu Ling, Wang Xiaoning and Shi Tao (Myers, Roger) (Filed on 9/26/2007)
September 26, 2007 101 Declaration of Morton Sklar Supporting the Submission of Additional Certifications by Plaintiffs of Their Knowledge and Understanding of Alternative Dispute Resolution Options filed byWang Xiaoning, Shi Tao, Yu Ling. (Myers, Roger) (Filed on 9/26/2007)
September 26, 2007 100 *** FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE SEE DOCKET # 102 . *** ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5b) of discussion of ADR options filed by Plaintiffs Yu Ling, Wang Xiaoning and Shi Tao (Myers, Roger) (Filed on 9/26/2007) Modified on 9/27/2007 (cp, COURT STAFF). Modified on 10/1/2007 (ewn, COURT STAFF).
September 20, 2007 99 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken re 94 ENLARGING TIME FOR PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTIONS TO DISMISS, PENDING A DECISION ON PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR INITIAL AND JURISDICTIONAL DISCOVERY TO RESPOND TO THE MOTIONS TO DISMISS AS MODIFIED (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2007) Modified on 9/21/2007 (cp, COURT STAFF).
September 19, 2007 98 Declaration of Matthew T. Kline in Support of 97 Memorandum in Opposition, to Plaintiffs' Motion to Enlarge Time filed byYahoo! Inc.. (Related document(s) 97 ) (Kline, Matthew) (Filed on 9/19/2007)
September 19, 2007 97 Memorandum in Opposition re 94 MOTION to Enlarge Time to Respond to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss and Associated Motions, Pending a Decision on Plaintiffs' Motion for Initial and Jurisdictional Discovery filed byYahoo! Inc.. (Petrocelli, Daniel) (Filed on 9/19/2007) Modified on 9/20/2007 (cp, COURT STAFF).
September 14, 2007 96 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Wang Xiaoning, Shi Tao, Yu Ling re 94 MOTION to Enlarge Time to Respond to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss and Associated Motions, Pending a Decision on Plaintiffs' Motion for Initial and Jurisdictional Discovery; Sklar Decl and [Proposed] Order (Myers, Roger) (Filed on 9/14/2007) Modified on 9/17/2007 (cp, COURT STAFF).
September 14, 2007 95 Declaration of Morton Sklar in Support of 94 MOTION to Enlarge Time to Respond to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss and Associated Motions, Pending a Decision on Plaintiffs' Motion for Initial and Jurisdictional Discovery filed byWang Xiaoning, Shi Tao, Yu Ling. (Related document(s) 94 ) (Myers, Roger) (Filed on 9/14/2007) Modified on 9/17/2007 (cp, COURT STAFF).
September 14, 2007 94 MOTION to Enlarge Time to Respond to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss and Associated Motions, Pending a Decision on Plaintiffs' Motion for Initial and Jurisdictional Discovery; Alternative Motion for an Enlargement of Time for Plaintiffs' Response filed by Wang Xiaoning, Shi Tao, Yu Ling. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Myers, Roger) (Filed on 9/14/2007) Modified on 9/17/2007 (cp, COURT STAFF).
September 14, 2007 93 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Wang Xiaoning, Shi Tao, Yu Ling re 90 MOTION to Initiate Initial and Jurisdictional Discovery ; Declaration of Morton Sklar and [Proposed] Order (Myers, Roger) (Filed on 9/14/2007) Modified on 9/17/2007 (cp, COURT STAFF).
September 14, 2007 92 Proposed Order re 90 MOTION to Initiate Initial and Jurisdictional Discovery by Wang Xiaoning, Shi Tao, Yu Ling. (Myers, Roger) (Filed on 9/14/2007) Modified on 9/17/2007 (cp, COURT STAFF).
September 14, 2007 91 Declaration of Sklar in Support of 90 MOTION to Initiate Initial and Jurisdictional Discovery filed byWang Xiaoning, Shi Tao, Yu Ling. (Related document(s) 90 ) (Myers, Roger) (Filed on 9/14/2007) Modified on 9/17/2007 (cp, COURT STAFF).
September 14, 2007 90 MOTION to Initiate Initial and Jurisdictional Discovery filed by Wang Xiaoning, Shi Tao, Yu Ling. Motion Hearing set for 11/1/2007 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Myers, Roger) (Filed on 9/14/2007) Modified on 9/17/2007 (cp, COURT STAFF).
September 11, 2007 ADR Remark: The ADR Phone Conference has been taken off calendar and will be rescheduled to a time closer to the Initial Case Management Conference date. (tjs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2007)
September 10, 2007 89 Declaration of Morton Sklar in Support of 88 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5b)of discussion of ADR options filed byWang Xiaoning, Shi Tao, Yu Ling. (Related document(s) 88 ) (Myers, Roger) (Filed on 9/10/2007)
September 10, 2007 88 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5b) of discussion of ADR options (Myers, Roger) (Filed on 9/10/2007)
September 10, 2007 87 ADR Clerks Notice Setting ADR Phone Conference on 9/17/07 at 10:30 a.m. Please take note that plaintiff's counsel initiates the call to all parties. (tjs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2007)
September 7, 2007 86 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5b) of discussion of ADR options filed by Yahoo! Holdings (Hong Kong) Ltd (Kennedy, Colleen) (Filed on 9/7/2007)
September 7, 2007 85 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5b) of discussion of ADR options filed by Yahoo! Inc. (Kennedy, Colleen) (Filed on 9/7/2007)
September 7, 2007 84 NOTICE of need for ADR Phone Conference (ADR L.R. 3-5 d) (Kennedy, Colleen) (Filed on 9/7/2007)
August 30, 2007 83 NOTICE by Yahoo! Inc. of Corrected Pleadings (Petrocelli, Daniel) (Filed on 8/30/2007)
August 29, 2007 82 Featured Case PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 8/29/7. *NOTE: PLEASE REVIEW THE PROTECTIVE ORDER FOR MODIFICATIONS**(klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2007)
August 27, 2007 81 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Wang Xiaoning, Shi Tao, Yu Ling re 79 Declaration in Support, 80 Proposed Order, 78 Memorandum in Opposition (Myers, Roger) (Filed on 8/27/2007)
August 27, 2007 80 Proposed Order Dismissing Defendants' Motion for Protective Order and (in the Alternative) [Proposed] Interim Protective Order by Wang Xiaoning, Shi Tao, Yu Ling. (Myers, Roger) (Filed on 8/27/2007)
August 27, 2007 79 Declaration of Morton Sklar in Support of 78 Memorandum in Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Protective Order Governing Confidential Information filed byWang Xiaoning, Shi Tao, Yu Ling. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) 78 ) (Myers, Roger) (Filed on 8/27/2007)
August 27, 2007 78 Memorandum in Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Protective Order Governing Confidential Information, and [Proposed] Interim Protective Order filed byWang Xiaoning, Shi Tao, Yu Ling. (Myers, Roger) (Filed on 8/27/2007)
August 27, 2007 77 Proposed Order re 76 MOTION to Strike Plaintiffs' State Law Causes of Action Pursuant to the California Anti-Slapp Statute by Yahoo! Inc.. (Petrocelli, Daniel) (Filed on 8/27/2007)
August 27, 2007 76 MOTION to Strike Plaintiffs' State Law Causes of Action Pursuant to the California Anti-Slapp Statute filed by Yahoo! Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 11/1/2007 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland. (Petrocelli, Daniel) (Filed on 8/27/2007)
August 27, 2007 75 Proposed Order re 73 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction by Yahaoo! Holdings (Hong Kong), Ltd.. (Petrocelli, Daniel) (Filed on 8/27/2007) Modified on 8/28/2007 (cp, COURT STAFF).
August 27, 2007 74 Declaration of Alfred Po Tak Tsoi in Support of 73 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction filed byYahaoo! Holdings (Hong Kong), Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-H# 2 Exhibit I)(Related document(s) 73 ) (Petrocelli, Daniel) (Filed on 8/27/2007) Modified on 8/28/2007 (cp, COURT STAFF).
August 27, 2007 73 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction ; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support filed by Yahaoo! Holdings (Hong Kong), Ltd.. Motion Hearing set for 11/1/2007 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland. (Petrocelli, Daniel) (Filed on 8/27/2007) Modified on 8/28/2007 (cp, COURT STAFF).
August 27, 2007 72 *** FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE DISREGARD. *** Declaration of Alfred Po Tak Tsoi in Support of 71 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction; Memorandum of Points Authorities in Support Thereof filed byYahaoo! Holdings (Hong Kong), Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-H# 2 Exhibit I)(Related document(s) 71 ) (Petrocelli, Daniel) (Filed on 8/27/2007) Modified on 8/27/2007 (feriab, COURT STAFF).
August 27, 2007 71 *** FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE DISREGARD. *** MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction; Memorandum of Points Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Yahaoo! Holdings (Hong Kong), Ltd.. Motion Hearing set for 11/1/2007 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland. (Petrocelli, Daniel) (Filed on 8/27/2007) Modified on 8/27/2007 (feriab, COURT STAFF).
August 27, 2007 70 *** FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE DISREGARD. *** Proposed Order re 69 MOTION to Strike Plaintiffs' State Law Causes of Action Pursuant to the California Anti-Slapp Statute by Yahoo! Inc.. (Petrocelli, Daniel) (Filed on 8/27/2007) Modified on 8/27/2007 (feriab, COURT STAFF).
August 27, 2007 69 *** FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE DISREGARD. *** MOTION to Strike Plaintiffs' State Law Causes of Action Pursuant to the California Anti-Slapp Statute filed by Yahoo! Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 11/1/2007 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland. (Petrocelli, Daniel) (Filed on 8/27/2007) Modified on 8/27/2007 (feriab, COURT STAFF).
August 27, 2007 68 Proposed Order re 67 MOTION for More Definite Statement by Yahoo! Inc.. (Petrocelli, Daniel) (Filed on 8/27/2007)
August 27, 2007 67 MOTION for More Definite Statement filed by Yahoo! Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 11/1/2007 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland. (Petrocelli, Daniel) (Filed on 8/27/2007)
August 27, 2007 66 Proposed Order re 65 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint by Yahoo! Inc.. (Petrocelli, Daniel) (Filed on 8/27/2007)
August 27, 2007 65 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint filed by Yahoo! Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 11/1/2007 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix A# 2 Exhibit A# 3 Exhibit B-E# 4 Exhibit F-H# 5 Appendix B# 6 Exhibit 1# 7 Exhibit 2-3# 8 Exhibit 4-12)(Petrocelli, Daniel) (Filed on 8/27/2007)
August 23, 2007 64 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken granting in part and denying in part 60 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages re Motion to Dismiss and for Plaintiffs' Opposition (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2007)
August 22, 2007 63 Featured Case NOTICE OF REFERENCE AND ORDER RE DISCOVERY PROCEDURES. Plaintiff shall electronically file a response to the Motion for Protective Order Governing Confidential Information no later than Aug. 27, 2007 . NO reply to the opposition shall be filed. After Court receives the opposition, the matter will be deemed submitted on the papers Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 8/22/7. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2007)
August 20, 2007 62 Declaration of Matthew T. Kline in Support of 61 Stipulation Pursuant to General Order No. 45, Section X filed byYahoo! Inc.. (Related document(s) 61 ) (Petrocelli, Daniel) (Filed on 8/20/2007)
August 20, 2007 61 Joint Stipulated Request for Additional Pages on Yahoo!, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss and Plaintiffs' Opposition; Proposed Order by Yahoo! Inc.. (Petrocelli, Daniel) (Filed on 8/20/2007) Modified on 8/21/2007 (cp, COURT STAFF).
August 20, 2007 60 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages re Motion to Dismiss and for Plaintiffs' Opposition filed by Yahoo! Inc.. (Petrocelli, Daniel) (Filed on 8/20/2007) Modified on 8/21/2007 (cp, COURT STAFF).
August 20, 2007 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero for disposition on Dfts' Motion for Protective Order Governing Confidential Information and all further Discovery. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2007)
August 17, 2007 59 Featured Case ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge for Discovery purposes, ORDER REFERRING MOTION: 57 MOTION for Protective Order Governing Confidential Information filed by Yahoo! Inc.. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 8/17/07. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2007)
August 15, 2007 58 Declaration of Matthew T. Kline in Support of 57 MOTION for Protective Order filed byYahoo! Inc.. (Related document(s) 57 ) (Petrocelli, Daniel) (Filed on 8/15/2007) Modified on 8/16/2007 (cp, COURT STAFF).
August 15, 2007 57 MOTION for Protective Order Governing Confidential Information; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support filed by Yahoo! Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 9/20/2007 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Petrocelli, Daniel) (Filed on 8/15/2007)
August 15, 2007 56 MEMORANDUM in Support of Yahoo!, Inc.'s Proposed Letter Soliciting the Views of the State Department filed byYahoo! Inc.. (Petrocelli, Daniel) (Filed on 8/15/2007)
August 15, 2007 55 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Wang Xiaoning, Shi Tao, Yu Ling re 54 Brief in Support of Plaintiffs' Proposed Statement of Interest Request, and Proposed Draft Letter for the Court (Myers, Roger) (Filed on 8/15/2007)
August 15, 2007 54 Brief in Support of Plaintiffs' Proposed Statement of Interest Request, and Proposed Draft Letter for the Court filed byWang Xiaoning, Shi Tao, Yu Ling. (Myers, Roger) (Filed on 8/15/2007)
July 31, 2007 53 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken denying 22 MOTION FOR AN EARLY CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND ORDER (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2007)
July 30, 2007 52 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Wang Xiaoning, Shi Tao, Yu Ling re 51 Amended Complaint [Second Amended Complaint for Tort Damages] (Myers, Roger) (Filed on 7/30/2007)
July 30, 2007 51 AMENDED COMPLAINT [Second Amended Complaint for Tort Damages] against all defendants. Filed byWang Xiaoning, Shi Tao, Yu Ling. (Myers, Roger) (Filed on 7/30/2007)
July 26, 2007 50 Featured Case ORDER re 42 granting Joint Stipulation re: Withdrawal of the Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint, Re: Filing of Second Amended Complaint, and Re: Extending Time Deadlines Accordingly. ****(Plaintiffs shall file 2nd amended complaint within 3 days)****. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 7/26/07. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2007)
July 26, 2007 49 Featured Case ORDER re 46 granting Stipulated Dismissal as to Defendant Alibaba.com, Inc.. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 7/26/07. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2007)
July 25, 2007 48 AMENDED CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Wang Xiaoning, Shi Tao, Yu Ling (Myers, Roger) (Filed on 7/25/2007) Modified on 7/26/2007 (cp, COURT STAFF).
July 25, 2007 47 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Wang Xiaoning, Shi Tao, Yu Ling re 46 Stipulation re Stipulated Dismissal as to Defendant Alibaba.com, Inc. and Proposed Order (Myers, Roger) (Filed on 7/25/2007)
July 25, 2007 46 Stipulated Dismissal as to Defendant Alibaba.com, Inc. by Wang Xiaoning, Shi Tao, Yu Ling. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Myers, Roger) (Filed on 7/25/2007) Modified on 7/26/2007 (cp, COURT STAFF).
July 19, 2007 45 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Yahoo! Inc. re 41 Amended Complaint, 43 Declaration in Support, 44 Declaration in Support, 42 Stipulation, 40 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion (Petrocelli, Daniel) (Filed on 7/19/2007)
July 19, 2007 44 Declaration of Matthew T, Kline Pursuant to General Order No. 45, Section X filed byYahoo! Inc.. (Related document(s) 43 , 42 ) (Petrocelli, Daniel) (Filed on 7/19/2007) Modified on 7/20/2007 (cp, COURT STAFF).
July 19, 2007 43 Declaration of Morton Sklar, Matthew T. Kline, and Scott Reynolds in Support of 42 Stipulation, Re: Withdrawal of the Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint, Re: Filing of Second Amended Complaint, and Re: Extending Time Deadlines Accordingly filed byYahoo! Inc.. (Related document(s) 42 ) (Petrocelli, Daniel) (Filed on 7/19/2007)
July 19, 2007 42 STIPULATION Joint Stipulation re: Withdrawal of the Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint, Re: Filing of Second Amended Complaint, and Re: Extending Time Deadlines Accordingly; Proposed Order by Yahoo! Inc.. (Petrocelli, Daniel) (Filed on 7/19/2007)
July 19, 2007 41 PROPOSED Second Amended Complaint for Tort Damages against Yahoo! Inc., Yahaoo! Holdings (Hong Kong), Ltd.. Filed byWang Xiaoning, Shi Tao, Yu Ling. (Petrocelli, Daniel) (Filed on 7/19/2007) Modified on 7/20/2007 (cp, COURT STAFF).
July 19, 2007 40 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion for Leave to File a Second Amended Complaint filed byWang Xiaoning, Shi Tao, Yu Ling. (Petrocelli, Daniel) (Filed on 7/19/2007)
July 13, 2007 39 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Wang Xiaoning, Shi Tao, Yu Ling re 36 Declaration in Support, 35 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint, 37 Proposed Order, 38 Amended Complaint (Second Amended Complaint) (Myers, Roger) (Filed on 7/13/2007)
July 13, 2007 38 PROPOSED AMENDED COMPLAINT Second Amended Complaint for Tort Damages against all defendants. Filed byWang Xiaoning, Shi Tao, Yu Ling. (Myers, Roger) (Filed on 7/13/2007) Modified on 7/16/2007 (cp, COURT STAFF).
July 13, 2007 37 Proposed Order re 35 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint by Wang Xiaoning, Shi Tao, Yu Ling. (Myers, Roger) (Filed on 7/13/2007)
July 13, 2007 36 Declaration of Morton Sklar in Support of 35 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint filed byWang Xiaoning, Shi Tao, Yu Ling. (Related document(s) 35 ) (Myers, Roger) (Filed on 7/13/2007)
July 13, 2007 35 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint filed by Wang Xiaoning, Shi Tao, Yu Ling. (Myers, Roger) (Filed on 7/13/2007)
July 12, 2007 34 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Yahoo! Inc. re 33 Reply Memorandum (Petrocelli, Daniel) (Filed on 7/12/2007)
July 12, 2007 33 Reply Memorandum re 22 MOTION FOR AN EARLY CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE and Order filed byYahoo! Inc.. (Petrocelli, Daniel) (Filed on 7/12/2007)
June 29, 2007 32 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken denying 9 Yahoo's Motion to Shorten Time on its motion for an early case management conference (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2007)
June 29, 2007 31 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Wang Xiaoning, Shi Tao, Yu Ling re 28 Memorandum in Opposition, 29 Declaration in Support, 30 Proposed Order re Defendants' Motion for an Early Case Management Conference and Order (Myers, Roger) (Filed on 6/29/2007)
June 29, 2007 30 Proposed Order re Motion for an Early Case Management Conference and Order by Wang Xiaoning, Shi Tao, Yu Ling. (Myers, Roger) (Filed on 6/29/2007) Modified on 7/2/2007 (cp, COURT STAFF).
June 29, 2007 29 Declaration of Morton Sklar in Support of 28 Memorandum in Opposition to Defendants' Motion for an Early Case Management Conference and Order filed byWang Xiaoning, Shi Tao, Yu Ling. (Related document(s) 28 ) (Myers, Roger) (Filed on 6/29/2007)
June 29, 2007 28 Memorandum in Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Early Case Management Conference and Order filed byWang Xiaoning, Shi Tao, Yu Ling. (Myers, Roger) (Filed on 6/29/2007)
June 25, 2007 27 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Wang Xiaoning, Shi Tao, Yu Ling re 24 Memorandum in Opposition of Defendant Yahoo! Inc.'s Motion to Shorten Time on its Motion for Early Case Management Conference and Order, Declaration of Morton Sklar in Support thereof and Proposed Order (Myers, Roger) (Filed on 6/25/2007)
June 25, 2007 26 Proposed Order re Motion to Shorten Time on its Motion for an Early Case Management Conference by Wang Xiaoning, Shi Tao, Yu Ling. (Myers, Roger) (Filed on 6/25/2007) Modified on 6/26/2007 (cp, COURT STAFF).
June 25, 2007 25 Declaration of Morton Sklar in Support of 24 Memorandum in Opposition to Defendant Yahoo! Inc.'s Motion to Shorten Time on its Motion for an Early Case Management Conference and Order filed byWang Xiaoning, Shi Tao, Yu Ling. (Related document(s) 24 ) (Myers, Roger) (Filed on 6/25/2007)
June 25, 2007 24 Memorandum in Opposition to Defendant Yahoo! Inc.'s Motion to Shorten Time on its Motion for an Early Case Management Conference and Order filed byWang Xiaoning, Shi Tao, Yu Ling. (Myers, Roger) (Filed on 6/25/2007)
June 22, 2007 23 NOTICE of Change of Address by Roger Rex Myers for Morton H. Sklar and World Organization for Human Rights USA (Myers, Roger) (Filed on 6/22/2007)
June 22, 2007 22 MOTION FOR AN EARLY CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND PROPOSED ORDER REFILED PURSUANT CLERK'S NOTICE DOCUMENT 21 filed by Yahoo! Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 7/2/2007 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland. (Petrocelli, Daniel) (Filed on 6/22/2007) Modified on 6/25/2007 (cp, COURT STAFF).
June 22, 2007 21 CLERK'S NOTICE re deficiency (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2007)
June 21, 2007 20 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wang Xiaoning, Shi Tao, Yu Ling. as to Alibaba.com (Dover, DE) (Myers, Roger) (Filed on 6/21/2007)
June 21, 2007 19 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wang Xiaoning, Shi Tao, Yu Ling. as to Alibaba.com (Irvine, CA) (Myers, Roger) (Filed on 6/21/2007)
June 21, 2007 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wang Xiaoning, Shi Tao, Yu Ling. as to Alibaba.com (Sunnyvale, CA) (Myers, Roger) (Filed on 6/21/2007)
June 21, 2007 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wang Xiaoning, Shi Tao, Yu Ling. Alibaba.com, Inc. served on 5/30/2007, answer due 6/19/2007. as to Alibaba.com, Inc. (Santa Clara, CA) (Myers, Roger) (Filed on 6/21/2007)
June 21, 2007 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wang Xiaoning, Shi Tao, Yu Ling. as to Yahoo! Inc. (Wilmington, DE) (Myers, Roger) (Filed on 6/21/2007)
June 21, 2007 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wang Xiaoning, Shi Tao, Yu Ling. as to Yahoo! Inc. (Los Angeles) (Myers, Roger) (Filed on 6/21/2007)
June 21, 2007 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wang Xiaoning, Shi Tao, Yu Ling. Yahoo! Inc. served on 5/30/2007, answer due 6/19/2007. as to Yahoo! Inc. (Sunnyvale, CA) (Myers, Roger) (Filed on 6/21/2007)
June 21, 2007 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Yahoo! Inc. re 11 Case Management Statement, 10 Declaration in Support, 9 MOTION to Shorten Time ON ITS MOTION FOR AN EARLY CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERNECE AND ORDER, 12 Declaration in Support, (Petrocelli, Daniel) (Filed on 6/21/2007)
June 21, 2007 12 Declaration of MATTHEW T. KLINE in Support of 11 Case Management Statement MOTION FOR AN EARLY CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND ORDER filed byYahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C)(Related document(s) 11 ) (Petrocelli, Daniel) (Filed on 6/21/2007)
June 21, 2007 11 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT MOTION FOR AN EARLY CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND ORDER; PROPOSED ORDER filed by Yahoo! Inc.. (Petrocelli, Daniel) (Filed on 6/21/2007)
June 21, 2007 10 Declaration of DANIEL M. PETROCELLI in Support of 9 MOTION to Shorten Time ON ITS MOTION FOR AN EARLY CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERNECE AND ORDER filed byYahoo! Inc.. (Related document(s) 9 ) (Petrocelli, Daniel) (Filed on 6/21/2007)
June 21, 2007 9 MOTION to Shorten Time ON ITS MOTION FOR AN EARLY CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERNECE AND PROOSED ORDER filed by Yahoo! Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 7/26/2007 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland. (Petrocelli, Daniel) (Filed on 6/21/2007) Modified on 6/22/2007 (cp, COURT STAFF).
June 19, 2007 8 Featured Case ORDER re 6 Stipulation, granting JOINT STIPULATED REQUEST FOR ORDER ENLARGING TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT AND EXTENDING INITIAL DEADLINES. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 6/19/07. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2007)
June 19, 2007 7 Certificate of Interested Entities by DEFENDANT YAHOO!, INC., SPECIALLY APPEARING DEFENDANT YAHOO! HOLDINGS (HONG KONG), LTD., AND ALIBABA.COM, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Signature Page (Declarations/Stipulations) DECLARATION OF MATTHEW T. KLINE PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER NO. 45, SECTION X# 2 PROOF OF SERVICE)(Kline, Matthew) (Filed on 6/19/2007) Modified on 6/20/2007 (cp, COURT STAFF).
June 18, 2007 6 JOINT STIPULATED REQUEST FOR ORDER ENLARGING TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT AND EXTENDING INITIAL DEADLINES; PROPOSED ORDER; DECLARATION OF DANIEL PETROCELLI by Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Signature Page (Declarations/Stipulations) DECLARATION OF MATTHEW T. KLINE PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER NO. 45, SECTION X# 2 PROOF OF SERVICE)(Kline, Matthew) (Filed on 6/18/2007) Modified on 6/19/2007 (cp, COURT STAFF).
May 29, 2007 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT For Tort Damages; jury demand against all defendants. Filed byShi Tao, Wang Xiaoning, Yu Ling. (Myers, Roger) (Filed on 5/29/2007) Modified on 5/30/2007 (cp, COURT STAFF).
April 24, 2007 4 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken granting 2 Motion for Pro Hac Vice - Morton H. Sklar (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2007)
April 18, 2007 CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2007)
April 18, 2007 Summons Issued as to Yahaoo! Holdings (Hong Kong), Ltd.. (Sunnyvale, CA) (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2007)
April 18, 2007 Summons Issued as to Yahaoo! Holdings (Hong Kong), Ltd.. (Causeway Bay, Hong Kong) (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2007)
April 18, 2007 Summons Issued as to Alibaba.com, Inc.. (Dover, DE) (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2007)
April 18, 2007 Summons Issued as to Alibaba.com, Inc.. (Irvine, CA) (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2007)
April 18, 2007 Summons Issued as to Alibaba.com, Inc.. (Sunnyvale, CA) (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2007)
April 18, 2007 Summons Issued as to Alibaba.com, Inc.. (Wanchai, Hong Kong) (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2007)
April 18, 2007 Summons Issued as to Alibaba.com, Inc.. (Santa Clara, CA) (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2007)
April 18, 2007 Summons Issued as to Alibaba.com, Inc.. (Newark, CA) (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2007)
April 18, 2007 Summons Issued as to Alibaba.com, Inc.. (Mountain View, CA) (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2007)
April 18, 2007 Summons Issued as to Yahoo! Inc.. (Wilmington, DE) (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2007)
April 18, 2007 Summons Issued as to Yahoo! Inc.. (Los Angeles) (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2007)
April 18, 2007 Summons Issued as to Yahoo! Inc.. ( Sunnyvale, CA) (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2007)
April 18, 2007 3 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 7/31/2007. Case Management Conference set for 8/7/2007 02:00 PM. (Attachments: # 1 Standing order)(cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2007)
April 18, 2007 2 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice - Morton H. Sklar ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 3461105435.) filed by Wang Xiaoning, Yu Ling. (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2007) Additional attachment(s) added on 4/23/2007 (cp, COURT STAFF).
April 18, 2007 1 COMPLAINT; jury demand against Yahoo! Inc., Yahaoo! Holdings (Hong Kong), Ltd., Alibaba.com, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 350,receipt number 34611005435.). Filed byWang Xiaoning, Yu Ling. (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2007) Additional attachment(s) added on 4/23/2007 (cp, COURT STAFF). Modified on 4/23/2007 (cp, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Xiaoning et al v. Yahoo! Inc, et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yu Ling
Represented By: Roger Rex Myers
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wang Xiaoning
Represented By: Roger Rex Myers
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shi Tao
Represented By: Roger Rex Myers
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yahoo! Holdings (Hong Kong), Ltd.
Represented By: Colleen M. Kennedy
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yahoo! Inc.
Represented By: Matthew Thomas Kline
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]