Oracle USA, Inc. et al v. Qtrax, Inc.

Plaintiff: Oracle USA, Inc. and Oracle International Corporation
Defendant: Qtrax, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2009cv03334
Filed: July 21, 2009
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge: Saundra Brown Armstrong
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 17:101 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 10, 2010 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Setting Briefing and REFERRING CASE to Chief Magistrate Judge for Report and Recommendation. The Telephonic Case Management Conference is CONTINUED to 04/14/2010 at 2:45 PM. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 2/10/10. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2010) Modified on 2/11/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
March 16, 2010 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SCHEDULING HEARING ON PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT. Hearing set for 05/05/10 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, 450 Golden Gate Ave., San Fran., CA 94102. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman, on 3/16/2010. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2010) Modified on 3/17/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
June 10, 2010 45 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 6/9/10. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2010)
June 18, 2010 50 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER 36 MOTION to Set Aside Default 30 AND 33 , 41 Amended MOTION to Set Aside Default. Responses due by 6/16/2010. Replies due by 6/25/2010. Motion Hearing set for 7/14/2010 02:00 PM.. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 6/17/10. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2010)
June 18, 2010 51 Opinion or Order of the Court SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 6/18/2010. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2010)
September 8, 2010 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 36 MOTION to Set Aside Default CORRECTION OF DOCKET 30 AND 33 filed by Qtrax, Inc., 41 Amended MOTION to Set Aside Default to Correct Time of Hearing filed by Qtrax, Inc.. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 9/3/10. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2010)
October 13, 2011 76 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 10/13/11. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2011)
June 19, 2012 79 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 6/6/12. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2012)
September 23, 2009 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: That the Case Management Conference is CONTINUED to 12/17/2009 at 03:00 PM., via telephone re 6 Letter Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 9/21/09. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2009) Modified on 9/24/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Oracle USA, Inc. et al v. Qtrax, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oracle USA, Inc.
Represented By: Deborah Kay Miller
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oracle International Corporation
Represented By: Deborah Kay Miller
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Qtrax, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]