Dimenco et al v. Service Employees International Union et al

Plaintiff: Roseanne Dimenco, Tyrone Dickens, Richard Marlowe, Juan Antonio Molina, Nicholas Palafox, Toni Rangel, Starla Rollin, Mykele Saunders and Martha Vazquez
Defendant: Service Employees International Union, David Regan and Eliseo Medina
Case Number: 4:2010cv03112
Filed: July 16, 2010
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Saundra Brown Armstrong
Nature of Suit: Labor/Management Reporting & Disclosure Act
Cause of Action: 29:0401
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 4, 2010 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING MOTION TO RELATE CASES. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 8/2/10. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2010) .
January 10, 2011 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Motions terminated: 15 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Starla Rollin, Richard Marlowe, Mykele Saunders, Toni Rangel, Martha Vazquez, Tyrone Dickens, Roseanne Dimenco, Nicholas Palafox, Juan Antonio Molina, 8 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel filed by Eliseo Medina, David Regan, Service Employees International Union., CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Conference set for 4/28/2011 03:30 PM. VIA TELEPHONE. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 1/4/11. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2011)
April 29, 2011 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 4/28/11. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2011)
May 13, 2011 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 5/10/11. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2011)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dimenco et al v. Service Employees International Union et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roseanne Dimenco
Represented By: Peter Alex Haberfeld
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyrone Dickens
Represented By: Peter Alex Haberfeld
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Marlowe
Represented By: Peter Alex Haberfeld
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan Antonio Molina
Represented By: Peter Alex Haberfeld
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas Palafox
Represented By: Peter Alex Haberfeld
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Toni Rangel
Represented By: Peter Alex Haberfeld
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Starla Rollin
Represented By: Peter Alex Haberfeld
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mykele Saunders
Represented By: Peter Alex Haberfeld
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martha Vazquez
Represented By: Peter Alex Haberfeld
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Service Employees International Union
Represented By: Jeffrey B. Demain
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Regan
Represented By: Jeffrey B. Demain
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eliseo Medina
Represented By: Jeffrey B. Demain
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]