Apple Inc. v. Amazon.Com, Inc. Featured Case

Apple's trademark lawsuit against Amazon.com over use of the word 'Appstore'

Plaintiff: Apple Inc.
Defendant: Amazon.Com, Inc. and Amazon Digital Services, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2011cv01327
Filed: March 18, 2011
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Phyllis J. Hamilton
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 26, 2012 95 Declaration of Sarah J. Givan in Support of 93 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on Apple's Claim for False Advertising (Fifth Cause of Action) filed byAmazon Digital Services, Inc., Amazon.Com, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 to Givan Declaration, # 2 Exhibit 2 to Givan Declaration, # 3 Exhibit 3 to Givan Declaration, # 4 Exhibit 4 to Givan Declaration, # 5 Exhibit 5A to Givan Declaration, # 6 Exhibit 5B to Givan Declaration, # 7 Exhibit 5C to Givan Declaration)(Related document(s) 93 ) (Givan, Sarah) (Filed on 9/26/2012)
September 26, 2012 94 Statement re 93 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on Apple's Claim for False Advertising (Fifth Cause of Action) -- Joint Statement of Undisputed Facts by Amazon Digital Services, Inc., Amazon.Com, Inc.. (Glick, Martin) (Filed on 9/26/2012)
September 26, 2012 93 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on Apple's Claim for False Advertising (Fifth Cause of Action) filed by Amazon Digital Services, Inc., Amazon.Com, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 10/31/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 3rd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton. Responses due by 10/10/2012. Replies due by 10/17/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Glick, Martin) (Filed on 9/26/2012)
August 28, 2012 92 Notice of Withdrawal of 73 MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY FROM AMAZON.COM, INC. (Eberhart, David) (Filed on 8/28/2012) Modified on 8/29/2012 (kc, COURT STAFF).
August 28, 2012 91 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 89 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Reply In Support Of Motion to Compel Discovery from Amazon.com, Inc. by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of David J. Sepanik In Support Of, # 2 Exhibit B to Sepanik Declaration, # 3 Exhibit C to Sepanik Declaration, # 4 Exhibit D to Sepanik Declaration, # 5 Exhibit E to Sepanik Declaration, # 6 Exhibit F to Sepanik Declaration, # 7 Exhibit H to Sepanik Declaration, # 8 Exhibit I to Sepanik Declaration, # 9 Exhibit J to Sepanik Declaration, # 10 Exhibit K to Sepanik Declaration)(Eberhart, David) (Filed on 8/28/2012)
August 28, 2012 90 REPLY (re 73 MOTION to Compel Discovery from Amazon.com, Inc ) /Reply In Support Of Motion to Compel filed byApple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of David J. Sepanik In Support Of, # 2 Exhibit A to Sepanik Declaration, # 3 Exhibit B to Sepanik Declaration, # 4 Exhibit C to Sepanik Declaration, # 5 Exhibit D to Sepanik Declaration, # 6 Exhibit E to Sepanik Declaration, # 7 Exhibit F to Sepanik Declaration, # 8 Exhibit G to Sepanik Declaration, # 9 Exhibit H to Sepanik Declaration, # 10 Exhibit I to Sepanik Declaration, # 11 Exhibit J to Sepanik Declaration, # 12 Exhibit K to Sepanik Declaration, # 13 Exhibit L to Sepanik Declaration)(Eberhart, David) (Filed on 8/28/2012)
August 23, 2012 89 Featured Case ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 80 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2012)
August 22, 2012 88 Declaration of Sean M. Callagy in Support of 80 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Apple Inc.'s Reply in Support of Motion to Compel Discovery From Amazon.com, Inc. (Supplemental) filed byAmazon Digital Services, Inc., Amazon.Com, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) 80 ) (Callagy, Sean) (Filed on 8/22/2012)
August 20, 2012 87 Featured Case ORDER CLARIFYING REQUIRED DECLARATION TO SUPPORT PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO FILE PORTIONS OF REPLY UNDER SEAL (Dkt. No. 80). Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 8/20/2012. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2012)
August 20, 2012 86 Featured Case ORDER RE: REQUIRED DECLARATION TO SUPPORT PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO FILE PORTIONS OF REPLY UNDER SEAL (Dkt. No. 80). Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 8/20/2012. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2012)
August 16, 2012 85 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 79 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,, Motion to Compel Discovery from Amazon.com, Inc. by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of David R. Eberhart In Support Of, # 2 Exhibit M, # 3 Exhibit N, # 4 Exhibit O, # 5 Exhibit P, # 6 Exhibit Q, # 7 Exhibit R, # 8 Exhibit S, # 9 Exhibit U, # 10 Exhibit V, # 11 Exhibit BB)(Eberhart, David) (Filed on 8/16/2012)
August 16, 2012 84 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 83 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Amazon's Opposition to Apple's Motion to Compel; Supporting Declaration of Sean M. Callagy; Exhibits 1-5 to Callagy Declaration by Amazon Digital Services, Inc., Amazon.Com, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5)(Callagy, Sean) (Filed on 8/16/2012)
August 16, 2012 83 Featured Case ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 76 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2012)
August 14, 2012 82 Declaration of Sean M. Callagy in Support of 80 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Apple Inc.'s Reply In Support of Motion to Compel Discovery From Amazon.com, Inc. filed byAmazon Digital Services, Inc., Amazon.Com, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) 80 ) (Callagy, Sean) (Filed on 8/14/2012)
August 14, 2012 81 Revised Declaration of Sean M. Callagy in Support of 76 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Amazon's Opposition to Apple's Motion to Compel and Supporting Declaration filed byAmazon Digital Services, Inc., Amazon.Com, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 [Proposed Redacted Version] Amazon's Opposition to Apple's Motion to Compel, # 3 Declaration of Sean M. Callagy ISO Amazon's Opposition to Apple's Motion to Compel, # 4 Exhibit 1 to Callagy Declaration, # 5 Exhibit 2 to Callagy Declaration, # 6 Exhibit 3 to Callagy Declaration, # 7 Exhibit 4 to Callagy Declaration, # 8 Exhibit 5 to Callagy Declaration, # 9 Exhibit 6 to Callagy Declaration, # 10 Exhibit 7 to Callagy Declaration, # 11 Exhibit 8 to Callagy Declaration)(Related document(s) 76 ) (Callagy, Sean) (Filed on 8/14/2012) Modified on 8/15/2012 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
August 10, 2012 80 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Reply in Support of Motion to Compel Discovery From Amazon.com Inc. filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Sepanik, David) (Filed on 8/10/2012) Modified on 8/13/2012 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
August 9, 2012 79 Featured Case ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 72 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; deferring ruling on 76 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2012) (Main Document 79 replaced on 8/9/2012) (fff, COURT STAFF).
August 8, 2012 78 RESPONSE (re 73 MOTION to Compel Discovery from Amazon.com, Inc ) filed byAmazon Digital Services, Inc., Amazon.Com, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Sean M. Callagy, # 2 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Sean M. Callagy, # 3 Exhibit 2 to Declaration of Sean M. Callagy, # 4 Exhibit 3 to Declaration of Sean M. Callagy, # 5 Exhibit 4 to Declaration of Sean M. Callagy, # 6 Exhibit 5 to Declaration of Sean M. Callagy, # 7 Exhibit 6 to Declaration of Sean M. Callagy, # 8 Exhibit 7 to Declaration of Sean M. Callagy, # 9 Exhibit 8 to Declaration of Sean M. Callagy)(Callagy, Sean) (Filed on 8/8/2012)
August 8, 2012 77 Declaration of Sean M. Callagy in Support of 72 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Apple Inc.'s Motion To Compel Discovery From Amazon.com, Inc. filed byAmazon Digital Services, Inc., Amazon.Com, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) 72 ) (Callagy, Sean) (Filed on 8/8/2012)
August 3, 2012 76 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Amazon's Opposition to Apple's Motion to Compel and Supporting Declaration filed by Amazon Digital Services, Inc., Amazon.Com, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Proposed Order)(Glick, Martin) (Filed on 8/3/2012)
August 2, 2012 75 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Daniel B. Asimow on Behalf of Defendants Amazon.com, Inc. and Amazon Digital Services, Inc. (Asimow, Daniel) (Filed on 8/2/2012)
July 25, 2012 Set/Reset Deadlines as to 73 MOTION to Compel Discovery from Amazon.com, Inc. Responses due by 8/3/2012. Replies due by 8/10/2012. Motion Hearing reset for 8/30/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2012) Modified on 7/25/2012 (ahm, COURT STAFF).
July 25, 2012 CLERKS NOTICE CONTINUING MOTION HEARING. TO ALL PARTIES AND COUNSEL OF RECORD:Please take notice that Plaintiffs Motion to Compel Discovery (Dkt. No. 73) is rescheduled for August 30, 2012 at 9:00 a.m., before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley, in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, Federal Building, 450 Golden Gate Avenue in San Francisco. (This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2012)
July 25, 2012 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley for Discovery (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2012)
July 24, 2012 74 Featured Case ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge for Discovery purposes. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 7/24/12. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2012)
July 20, 2012 73 MOTION to Compel Discovery from Amazon.com, Inc filed by Apple Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 8/29/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 3rd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton. Responses due by 8/3/2012. Replies due by 8/10/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Proof of Service, # 3 Declaration of David R. Eberhart, # 4 Exhibit A to Declaration of David R. Eberhart, # 5 Exhibit B to Declaration of David R. Eberhart, # 6 Exhibit C to Declaration of David R. Eberhart, # 7 Exhibit D to Declaration of David R. Eberhart, # 8 Exhibit E to Declaration of David R. Eberhart, # 9 Exhibit F to Declaration of David R. Eberhart, # 10 Exhibit G to Declaration of David R. Eberhart, # 11 Exhibit H to Declaration of David R. Eberhart, # 12 Exhibit I to Declaration of David R. Eberhart, # 13 Exhibit J to Declaration of David R. Eberhart, # 14 Exhibit K to Declaration of David R. Eberhart, # 15 Exhibit L to Declaration of David R. Eberhart, # 16 Exhibit M to Declaration of David R. Eberhart, # 17 Exhibit N to Declaration of David R. Eberhart, # 18 Exhibit O to Declaration of David R. Eberhart, # 19 Exhibit P to Declaration of David R. Eberhart, # 20 Exhibit Q to Declaration of David R. Eberhart, # 21 Exhibit R to Declaration of David R. Eberhart, # 22 Exhibit S to Declaration of David R. Eberhart, # 23 Exhibit T to Declaration of David R. Eberhart, # 24 Exhibit U to Declaration of David R. Eberhart, # 25 Exhibit V to Declaration of David R. Eberhart, # 26 Exhibit W to Declaration of David R. Eberhart, # 27 Exhibit X to Declaration of David R. Eberhart, # 28 Exhibit Y to Declaration of David R. Eberhart, # 29 Exhibit Z to Declaration of David R. Eberhart, # 30 Exhibit AA to Declaration of David R. Eberhart, # 31 Exhibit BB to Declaration of David R. Eberhart)(Eberhart, David) (Filed on 7/20/2012)
July 20, 2012 72 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Eberhart, David) (Filed on 7/20/2012)
March 23, 2012 71 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel B. Asimow as Counsel for Defendants Amazon.com, Inc. and Amazon Digital Services, Inc. (Asimow, Daniel) (Filed on 3/23/2012)
March 23, 2012 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Non-Expert Discovery due by 7/13/2012. Disclosure of Experts due by 7/27/2012. Expert Rebuttals due by 8/24/2012. Expert Discovery due by 9/14/2012. Dispositive Motions to be heard by 10/31/2012. Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/25/2013 02:00 PM. Jury Selection set for 8/19/2013 08:30 AM before Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton. Jury Trial set for 8/19/2013 08:30 AM before Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2012)
March 23, 2012 70 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER MODIFYING CASE SCHEDULE by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton finding as moot 68 Stipulation; granting 69 Stipulation (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2012)
March 20, 2012 69 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER CORRECTED STIPULATED REQUEST FOR AN ORDER MODIFYING CASE SCHEDULE AND [PROPOSED] ORDER filed by Apple Inc.. (Eberhart, David) (Filed on 3/20/2012)
March 20, 2012 68 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER STIPULATED REQUEST FOR AN ORDER MODIFYING CASE SCHEDULE AND [PROPOSED] ORDER filed by Apple Inc.. (Eberhart, David) (Filed on 3/20/2012)
February 23, 2012 67 NOTICE of Appearance by Sean Michael Callagy (Callagy, Sean) (Filed on 2/23/2012)
February 14, 2012 66 Featured Case ORDER DENYING REQUEST FOR AN ORDER EXTENDING DISCOVERY DEADLINES by Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton denying 65 Stipulation.(nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2012)
February 13, 2012 65 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER STIPULATED REQUEST FOR AN ORDER EXTENDING DISCOVERY DEADLINES AND [PROPOSED] ORDER filed by Apple Inc.. (Eberhart, David) (Filed on 2/13/2012)
January 12, 2012 64 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING DISCOVERY DEADLINE re 63 Stipulation filed by Amazon Digital Services, Inc., Amazon.Com, Inc. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 1/12/12. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2012)
January 9, 2012 63 STIPULATION FOR AN ORDER EXTENDING DISCOVERY DEADLINE; Proposed Order by Amazon Digital Services, Inc., Amazon.Com, Inc.. (Glick, Martin) (Filed on 1/9/2012) Modified on 1/10/2012 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
January 5, 2012 62 NOTICE by Amazon Digital Services, Inc., Amazon.Com, Inc. of Firm Combination (Wang, Elizabeth) (Filed on 1/5/2012)
January 3, 2012 61 Featured Case STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 1/3/12. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2012)
January 2, 2012 60 ANSWER TO 58 COUNTERCLAIM by Apple Inc.. (Eberhart, David) (Filed on 1/2/2012) Modified on 1/3/2012 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
December 30, 2011 59 PROPOSED STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER by Amazon Digital Services, Inc., Amazon.Com, Inc.. (Padden, Ryan) (Filed on 12/30/2011) Modified on 1/3/2012 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
December 19, 2011 58 ANSWER to Second Amended Complaint and Affirmative Defenses with COUNTERCLAIM byAmazon Digital Services, Inc., Amazon.Com, Inc.. (Glick, Martin) (Filed on 12/19/2011) Modified on 12/20/2011 (kc, COURT STAFF). Modified on 1/3/2012 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
November 17, 2011 57 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER RE FILING OF AND RESPONDING TO SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT re 55 Stipulation filed by Apple Inc. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 11/17/11. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2011)
November 16, 2011 56 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against Amazon.Com, Inc., Amazon Digital Services, Inc.. Filed by Apple Inc.. (Eberhart, David) (Filed on 11/16/2011) Modified on 11/17/2011 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
November 16, 2011 55 STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER RE FILING OF AND RESPONDING TO SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO F.R.C.P. 15(a)(2)-(3) by Apple Inc.. (Eberhart, David) (Filed on 11/16/2011)
July 18, 2011 54 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Apple Inc.. Amazon Digital Services, Inc. served on 4/18/2011, answer due 5/9/2011. (Eberhart, David) (Filed on 7/18/2011)
July 11, 2011 53 Joint Response to 50 Minute Order of June 30, 2011 by Apple Inc.. (Eberhart, David) (Filed on 7/11/2011) Modified on 7/12/2011 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
July 6, 2011 52 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Hamilton denying 18 Motion for Preliminary Injunction (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2011)
July 6, 2011 51 Featured Case CASE MANAGEMENT AND PRETRIAL ORDER re 50 Case Management Conference - Initial. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 7/6/11. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2011)
June 30, 2011 50 Minute Entry: Initial Case Management Conference held on 6/30/2011 before Phyllis J. Hamilton (Date Filed: 6/30/2011), Case referred to Private ADR. Non-Expert Discovery due by 2/15/2012. Disclosure of Experts due by 3/14/2012. Expert Discovery due by 5/2/2012. Dispositive Motions to be heard by 6/13/2012. Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/20/2012 02:00 PM. Jury Selection set for 10/15/2012 08:30 AM before Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton. Jury Trial set for 10/15/2012 08:30 AM before Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton. (Court Reporter Not Reported.) (nah, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/30/2011)
June 23, 2011 49 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Apple Inc., Amazon Digital Services, Inc., Amazon.Com, Inc.. (Eberhart, David) (Filed on 6/23/2011) Modified on 6/24/2011 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
June 22, 2011 48 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 6/22/2011 before Phyllis J. Hamilton (Date Filed: 6/22/2011) re 18 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION filed by Apple Inc. (Court Reporter Raynee Mercado.) (nah, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/22/2011)
June 8, 2011 47 Declaration of Thomas R. La Perle in Support of 45 Reply to Opposition/Response filed byApple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5)(Related document(s) 45 ) (Eberhart, David) (Filed on 6/8/2011)
June 8, 2011 46 Declaration of David R. Eberhart in Support of 45 Reply to Opposition/Response filed byApple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)(Related document(s) 45 ) (Eberhart, David) (Filed on 6/8/2011)
June 8, 2011 45 REPLY (re 18 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION ) Apple Inc.'s Reply in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed byApple Inc.. (Eberhart, David) (Filed on 6/8/2011)
June 1, 2011 44 EXHIBITS re 39 Declaration in Support, Continuation of Exhibits filed byAmazon Digital Services, Inc., Amazon.Com, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 28, # 2 Exhibit 29, # 3 Exhibit 30a, # 4 Exhibit 30b, # 5 Exhibit 31, # 6 Exhibit 32a, # 7 Exhibit 32b)(Related document(s) 39 ) (Givan, Sarah) (Filed on 6/1/2011)
June 1, 2011 43 EXHIBITS re 39 Declaration in Support, Continuation of Exhibits filed byAmazon Digital Services, Inc., Amazon.Com, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 25a, # 2 25b, # 3 26, # 4 27a, # 5 27b, # 6 27c, # 7 27d, # 8 27e)(Related document(s) 39 ) (Givan, Sarah) (Filed on 6/1/2011)
June 1, 2011 42 EXHIBITS re 39 Declaration in Support, Continuation of Exhibits filed byAmazon Digital Services, Inc., Amazon.Com, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 22a, # 2 22b, # 3 22c, # 4 22d, # 5 22e, # 6 22f, # 7 22g, # 8 23, # 9 24)(Related document(s) 39 ) (Givan, Sarah) (Filed on 6/1/2011)
June 1, 2011 41 EXHIBITS re 39 Declaration in Support, Continuation of Exhibits filed byAmazon Digital Services, Inc., Amazon.Com, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 18a, # 2 Exhibit 18b, # 3 Exhibit 18c, # 4 Exhibit 19, # 5 Exhibit 20a, # 6 Exhibit 20b, # 7 Exhibit 21)(Related document(s) 39 ) (Givan, Sarah) (Filed on 6/1/2011)
June 1, 2011 40 EXHIBITS re 39 Declaration in Support, Continuation of Exhibits filed byAmazon Digital Services, Inc., Amazon.Com, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 13a, # 2 Exhibit 13b, # 3 Exhibit 13c, # 4 Exhibit 13d, # 5 Exhibit 13e, # 6 Exhibit 14, # 7 Exhibit 15, # 8 Exhibit 16, # 9 Exhibit 17)(Related document(s) 39 ) (Givan, Sarah) (Filed on 6/1/2011)
June 1, 2011 39 Declaration of Sarah J. Givan in Support of 36 Opposition/Response to Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed byAmazon Digital Services, Inc., Amazon.Com, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12)(Related document(s) 36 ) (Givan, Sarah) (Filed on 6/1/2011)
June 1, 2011 38 Declaration of Ameesh Paleja in Support of 36 Opposition/Response to Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed byAmazon Digital Services, Inc., Amazon.Com, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4)(Related document(s) 36 ) (Glick, Martin) (Filed on 6/1/2011)
June 1, 2011 37 Declaration of Aaron Rubenson in Support of 36 Opposition/Response to Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed byAmazon Digital Services, Inc., Amazon.Com, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Related document(s) 36 ) (Glick, Martin) (Filed on 6/1/2011)
June 1, 2011 36 RESPONSE (re 18 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION ) filed byAmazon Digital Services, Inc., Amazon.Com, Inc.. (Glick, Martin) (Filed on 6/1/2011)
May 19, 2011 35 ANSWER TO COUNTERCLAIM 33 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim PLAINTIFF APPLE INC.S ANSWER TO DEFENDANTS COUNTERCLAIM byApple Inc.. (Eberhart, David) (Filed on 5/19/2011)
April 26, 2011 34 Featured Case ORDER DENYING APPLE INC.'S MOTION SHORTEN TIME TO HEAR ITS MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton denying 25 Motion to Shorten Time (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2011)
April 25, 2011 33 DEFENDANTS' ANSWER to Amended Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against Apple Inc. byAmazon.Com, Inc., Amazon Digital Services, Inc.. (Glick, Martin) (Filed on 4/25/2011)
April 18, 2011 32 Statement of Disclosure (Fed. R. Civ. Proc. 7.1) by Amazon Digital Services, Inc.. (Glick, Martin) (Filed on 4/18/2011)
April 18, 2011 31 Certificate of Interested Entities by Amazon Digital Services, Inc. (Glick, Martin) (Filed on 4/18/2011)
April 18, 2011 30 Declaration of Dana Northcott in Support of 28 Opposition/Response to Motion to Shorten Time to Hear Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed byAmazon Digital Services, Inc., Amazon.Com, Inc.. (Related document(s) 28 ) (Glick, Martin) (Filed on 4/18/2011)
April 18, 2011 29 Declaration of Martin R. Glick in Support of 28 Opposition/Response to Motion to Shorten Time to Hear Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed byAmazon Digital Services, Inc., Amazon.Com, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)(Related document(s) 28 ) (Glick, Martin) (Filed on 4/18/2011)
April 18, 2011 28 RESPONSE (re 25 MOTION to Shorten Time TO HEAR MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION ) filed byAmazon Digital Services, Inc., Amazon.Com, Inc.. (Glick, Martin) (Filed on 4/18/2011)
April 13, 2011 27 Proposed Order re 25 MOTION to Shorten Time TO HEAR MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING APPLE INC.'S MOTION TO SHORTEN TIME TO HEAR ITS MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION by Apple Inc.. (Eberhart, David) (Filed on 4/13/2011)
April 13, 2011 26 Declaration of David R. Eberhart in Support of 25 MOTION to Shorten Time TO HEAR MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION filed byApple Inc.. (Related document(s) 25 ) (Eberhart, David) (Filed on 4/13/2011)
April 13, 2011 25 MOTION to Shorten Time TO HEAR MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION filed by Apple Inc.. (Eberhart, David) (Filed on 4/13/2011)
April 13, 2011 24 Proposed Order re 18 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF APPLE INC.'S MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION by Apple Inc.. (Eberhart, David) (Filed on 4/13/2011)
April 13, 2011 23 Declaration of Matthew Fischer in Support of 18 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION filed byApple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2a, # 3 Exhibit 2b, # 4 Exhibit 2c, # 5 Exhibit 3, # 6 Exhibit 4, # 7 Exhibit 5, # 8 Exhibit 6, # 9 Exhibit 7, # 10 Exhibit 8, # 11 Exhibit 9a, # 12 Exhibit 9b, # 13 Exhibit 10, # 14 Exhibit 11, # 15 Exhibit 12)(Related document(s) 18 ) (Eberhart, David) (Filed on 4/13/2011)
April 13, 2011 22 Declaration of Robert A. Leonard in Support of 18 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION filed byApple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5a, # 6 Exhibit 5b, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10)(Related document(s) 18 ) (Eberhart, David) (Filed on 4/13/2011)
April 13, 2011 21 Declaration of Thomas R. La Perle in Support of 18 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION filed byApple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5a, # 6 Exhibit 5b, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10)(Related document(s) 18 ) (Eberhart, David) (Filed on 4/13/2011)
April 13, 2011 20 Declaration of John Wright in Support of 18 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION filed byApple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Related document(s) 18 ) (Eberhart, David) (Filed on 4/13/2011)
April 13, 2011 19 Declaration of David R. Eberhart in Support of 18 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION filed byApple Inc.. (Related document(s) 18 ) (Eberhart, David) (Filed on 4/13/2011)
April 13, 2011 18 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION filed by Apple Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 6/22/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 3rd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton. (Eberhart, David) (Filed on 4/13/2011)
April 11, 2011 17 Summons Issued as to Amazon Digital Services, Inc.. (vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2011)
April 8, 2011 16 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Amazon.Com, Inc., Amazon Digital Services, Inc.. Filed byApple Inc.. (Eberhart, David) (Filed on 4/8/2011)
April 8, 2011 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah Jean Givan as Counsel for Defendant Amazon.com, Inc. (Givan, Sarah) (Filed on 4/8/2011)
April 8, 2011 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Clara J. Shin as Counsel for Defendant Amazon.com, Inc. (Shin, Clara) (Filed on 4/8/2011)
April 8, 2011 13 Statement DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (FED. R. CIV. PROC. 7.1) by Amazon.Com, Inc.. (Glick, Martin) (Filed on 4/8/2011)
April 8, 2011 12 Certificate of Interested Entities by Amazon.Com, Inc. (Glick, Martin) (Filed on 4/8/2011)
April 8, 2011 11 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT (Civil L.R. 6-1(a)) by Amazon.Com, Inc.. (Glick, Martin) (Filed on 4/8/2011)
March 28, 2011 10 Featured Case ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 6/23/2011. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/30/2011 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 3/28/11. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2011)
March 24, 2011 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Apple Inc.. Amazon.Com, Inc. served on 3/21/2011, answer due 4/11/2011. (Eberhart, David) (Filed on 3/24/2011)
March 23, 2011 7 Featured Case ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu no longer assigned to the case. Signed by the Executive Committee on March 23, 2011. (cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2011)
March 22, 2011 6 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2011)
March 22, 2011 5 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding trademark infringement (cc: form mailed to register). (vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2011)
March 21, 2011 4 Declination to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge by Apple Inc.. (vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2011) Modified on 3/23/2011 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
March 18, 2011 8 Certificate of Interested Entities by Apple Inc. (vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2011)
March 18, 2011 3 Summons Issued as to Amazon.Com, Inc.. (vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2011) (vlk, COURT STAFF).
March 18, 2011 2 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 6/22/2011. Case Management Conference set for 6/29/2011 01:30 PM. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order)(vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2011)
March 18, 2011 CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2011)
March 18, 2011 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand (summons issued) against Amazon.Com, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 34611057676.) filed by Apple Inc.. (vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2011) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/23/2011: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (vlk, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Apple Inc. v. Amazon.Com, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Apple Inc.
Represented By: David J. Sepanik
Represented By: David R. Eberhart
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon.Com, Inc.
Represented By: Sarah Jean Givan
Represented By: Martin R. Glick
Represented By: Clara J. Shin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon Digital Services, Inc.
Represented By: Martin R. Glick
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]