Barron v. Cate et al

Respondent: Matthew Cate and Mike Stainer
Petitioner: Anthony Raul Barron
Case Number: 4:2011cv02797
Filed: June 8, 2011
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Phyllis J. Hamilton
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 30, 2011 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 8/30/11. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2011)
January 25, 2013 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 1/25/2013. (hlkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2013)
March 5, 2013 43 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton Denying Motion to Appoint Counsel and Granting Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis.(hlkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barron v. Cate et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Matthew Cate
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Mike Stainer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Anthony Raul Barron
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]