Hazelwood et al v. A.W.Chesterton Company et al

Defendant: Honeywell International Inc., A.W.Chesterton Company and Pneumo Abex LLC
Plaintiff: Moyer Hazelwood and Sue Hazelwood
Case Number: 4:2012cv01313
Filed: March 16, 2012
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Claudia Wilken
Nature of Suit: Asbestos Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 30, 2012 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF RECUSAL AND REQUEST FOR IMMEDIATE REASSIGNMENT IN LIGHT OF PENDING MOTION FOR REMAND (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 3/30/2012)
April 3, 2012 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 14 STIPULATION OF PLAINTIFFS AND DEFENDANT PNEUMO ABEX LLC TO SHORTEN TIME FOR HEARING ON PLAINTIFFS' 16 MOTION TO REMAND. Responses due by 4/5/2012. Replies due by 4/8/2012. Motion Hearing set for 4/12/2012 02:00 PM before Hon. Claudia Wilken. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 4/3/2012. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2012)
April 3, 2012 26 Opinion or Order of the Court MDL ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to the Eastern District of PA (MDL No. 875). (Attachments: # 1 cover letter)(cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2012)
June 8, 2012 27 Opinion or Order of the Court MDL ORDER REMANDING CASE TO THE NORTHERN DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA (MDL #875). Case reopened.. Signed by Judge MDL Panel on 6/8/2012. (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2012)
June 20, 2012 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS 31 RENEWED MOTION TO REMAND. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 6/20/2012. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2012)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hazelwood et al v. A.W.Chesterton Company et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honeywell International Inc.
Represented By: David Raymond Ongaro
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A.W.Chesterton Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pneumo Abex LLC
Represented By: Thomas J. Moses
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Moyer Hazelwood
Represented By: Sean P. Worsey
Represented By: William A. Levin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sue Hazelwood
Represented By: Sean P. Worsey
Represented By: William A. Levin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]