Hernandez v. Path, Inc.

Plaintiff: Oscar Hernandez
Defendant: Path, Inc.
 
Case Number: 4:2012cv01515
Filed: March 26, 2012
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
 
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
October 19, 2012 33 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers Granting in Part and Denying in Part 16 Motion to Dismiss. By November 9, 2012, Plaintiff shall file either a 2nd amended complaint or statement that he will proceed on 1st amended complaint. (ygrlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2012).
October 23, 2012 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Case Management Conference RESET for 12/17/2012 02:00 PM.. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 10/23/12. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2012)
December 12, 2012 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE;CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Order to Show Cause Hearing set for Friday, 12/21/2012 09:01 AM. Show Cause Response due by 12/17/2012. Case Management Conference set for 12/17/2012 is CONTINUED to 1/7/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland.. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 12/12/12. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2012)
April 8, 2013 63 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re Judicial Referral to Hon. Jon. S. Tigar for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases re C-12-1515-YGR and C-12-1529-YGR whether cases are related to C-13-0453-JST. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 4/8/13. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2013)
April 10, 2013 64 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING SCHEDULE REGARDING JUDICIAL REFERRAL TO DETERMINE WHETHER CASES ARE RELATED re (52 in 4:12-cv-01515-YGR) MOTION to Relate Case No. 4:13-cv-00453-DMR filed by Apple Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on April 9, 2013. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2013)
May 17, 2013 72 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SCHEDULING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 6/7/2013. Case Management Conference set for 6/21/2013 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on May 17, 2013. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order, # 2 Standing Order for All Judges of the Northern District)(wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2013)
July 1, 2013 76 Opinion or Order of the Court SCHEDULING ORDER re (342 in 3:13-cv-00453-JST) Proposed Order filed by Oscar Hernandez. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on July 1, 2013. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2013)
September 16, 2013 83 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REQUIRING SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING REGARDING ORGANIZATION OF PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL re (352 in 3:13-cv-00453-JST) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER AMONG PLAINTIFFS' COUNSEL IN RELATED CASES REGARDING ORGANIZATION OF PLAINTIFFS' COUNSEL IN ALL CASES. Supplemental Briefing due by 10/4/2013. Further Case Management Conference set for 10/15/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on September 16, 2013. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2013)
October 22, 2013 87 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DESIGNATING INTERIM CLASS COUNSEL. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on October 21, 2013. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2013)
January 9, 2014 89 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: JOINT LETTER BRIEF REGARDING PROTECTIVE ORDER DISPUTE re (429 in 3:13-cv-00453-JST) Joint Discovery Letter Brief on Protective Order filed by Gowalla Incorporated, Yelp! Inc., Path, Inc., Steve Dean, Nirali Mandaywala, Guili Biondi, Facebook Inc., Rovio Mobile Oy, Steven Gutierrez, Oscar Hernandez, Hipster, Inc., Twitter, Inc., Foursquare Labs, Inc., Judy Long, Rachelle King, Alan Beueshasen, Chillingo Ltd., Apple Inc, ZeptoLab UK Limited, Francisco Espitia, Foodspotting, Inc., Kik Interactive, Inc., Instagram, Inc., Jason Green, Instagram, LLC, Gentry Hoffman, Claire Moses, Electronic Arts Inc., Maria Pirozzi, Greg Varner. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on January 9, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2014)
February 4, 2014 90 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: CONDUCT OF MOTION TO DISMISS HEARINGS. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on February 3, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2014)
May 14, 2014 91 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO DISMISS by Judge Jon S. Tigar in case 3:12-cv-01529-JST; granting in part and denying in part (393) Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part (394) Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part (395) Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part (396) Motion to Dismiss in case 3:13-cv-00453-JST. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2014)
August 17, 2014 94 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re (491 in 3:13-cv-00453-JST) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Setting Page Limits for Defendant Apple Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Second Consolidated Amended Complaint filed by Apple Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on August 15, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2014)
August 28, 2014 95 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON JOINT LETTER BRIEF REGARDING PLAINTIFFS' REQUEST TO OPEN DISCOVERY re (490 in 3:13-cv-00453-JST) Letter Brief, filed by Scott Medlock, Steve Dean, Nirali Mandaywala, Guili Biondi, Oscar Hernandez, Steven Gutierrez, Judy Long , Rachelle King, Alan Beueshasen, Haig Arabian, Francisco Espitia, Marc Opperman, Jason Green, Gentry Hoffman, Claire Moses, Alicia Medlock, Greg Varner. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on August 28, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Hernandez v. Path, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oscar Hernandez
Represented By: Brian R Strange
Represented By: Joseph H Malley
Represented By: Brian Russell Strange
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Path, Inc.
Represented By: Tyler Griffin Newby
Represented By: Jedediah Wakefield
Represented By: Shane Benjamin Witnov
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]