GOOR v. VIGNOLES

Plaintiff: MARTIN GOOR
Defendant: MARK VIGNOLES
Case Number: 4:2012cv01794
Filed: April 11, 2012
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Donna M. Ryu
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 12:1819
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 11, 2012 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: ATTENDANCE AT MEDIATION. Signed by Judge Laporte on 10/11/12. (edllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2012)
November 13, 2012 52 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu denying 39 Motion to Transfer Case.(dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2012)
January 30, 2013 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 01/30/2013. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GOOR v. VIGNOLES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARTIN GOOR
Represented By: CHRISTIAN JOHN JENSEN
Represented By: MICHAEL J. FELDMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARK VIGNOLES
Represented By: ALAN FREDERICK KAUFMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.