Bozzio v. EMI Group Limited et al

Defendant: Capitol Records LLC, EMI Music North America, LLC, EMI Recorded Music, EMI Marketing and EMI Group Limited
Plaintiff: Dale Bozzio
 
Case Number: 4:2012cv02421
Filed: May 11, 2012
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
 
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
August 27, 2012 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING AND CONTINUING HEARING ON MOTION TO DISMISS. The Hearing on the pending Motion to Dismiss is VACATED AND RESET to October 2, 2012 at 2:00pm. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 8/27/12. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2012)
October 16, 2012 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING AND CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Conference set for 10/22/2012 is VACATED. Case Management Conference reset to 1/7/2013 at 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 10/16/12. (kc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2012)
December 26, 2012 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING 1/7/2013 CMC DATE AND RESETTING Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/11/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland.Motions terminated: 36 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO CONTINUE INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 12/26/12. (kk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/26/2012)
March 11, 2013 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting 16 Motion to Dismiss without Leave to Amend. The First Amended Complaint is DISMISSED. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Bozzio v. EMI Group Limited et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capitol Records LLC
Represented By: Richard Christian Harlan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EMI Music North America, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EMI Recorded Music
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EMI Marketing
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EMI Group Limited
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dale Bozzio
Represented By: R. Alexander Saveri
Represented By: Carl Nils Hammarskjold
Represented By: Melissa Conwell Shapiro
Represented By: Cadio R. Zirpoli
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]