Charles v. Best Buy Co., Inc.

Plaintiff: Shaun Charles
Defendant: Best Buy Co., Inc.
Case Number: 4:2012cv02934
Filed: June 6, 2012
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Maxine M. Chesney
Nature of Suit: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 29, 2012 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Case Management Conference is continued from September 7, 2012 to September 21, 2012. A Joint Case Management Statement shall be filed no later than September 14, 2012. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on August 29, 2012. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2012)
September 12, 2012 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SELECTING ADR PROCESS. The parties' stipulation to be referred to private ADR is granted. The deadline to complete private mediation is March 2013. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on Septermber 12, 2012. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2012)
September 21, 2012 23 Opinion or Order of the Court PRETRIAL PREPARATION ORDER. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 9/21/12. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2012)
January 30, 2013 25 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on January 30, 2013. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2013)
February 25, 2013 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION. The deadline to complete mediation is continued to April 30, 2013, and the discovery cutoff is continued to July 19, 2013. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 25, 2013. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Charles v. Best Buy Co., Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shaun Charles
Represented By: Sharon Cohen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Best Buy Co., Inc.
Represented By: Eden Edwards Anderson
Represented By: Michael J. Burns, Esq.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]