Korb v. Commissioner of Social Security et al

Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security and Social Security Administration Operations Center
Plaintiff: Richard E. Korb
Case Number: 4:2012cv03847
Filed: July 23, 2012
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Phyllis J. Hamilton
Nature of Suit: Retirement and Survivors Benefits
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 14, 2013 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH REASSIGNMENT ORDER AND SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/3/2013 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on March 14, 2013. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order)(wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2013)
September 19, 2013 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO DISMISS by Judge Jon S. Tigar, granting 31 Motion to Dismiss. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2013)
January 28, 2014 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING MOTION HEARING re 43 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Commissioner of Social Security. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on January 27, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2014)
April 11, 2014 54 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 53 Proposed Order filed by Richard E. Korb, Faye Y. Korb. Further Case Management Conference set for 6/18/2014 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on April 11, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2014)
June 4, 2014 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting in part and denying in part 43 Motion to Dismiss. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2014)
September 2, 2014 58 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 57 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER for Extension of Time filed by Commissioner of Social Security. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on September 2, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2014)
October 9, 2014 61 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 60 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO CONTINUE CMC filed by Richard E. Korb, Faye Y. Korb. Case Management Statement due by 1/7/2015. Further Case Management Conference set for 1/21/2015 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on October 9, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2014)
December 4, 2014 64 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 63 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO CONTINUEDEADLINES FOR FILING OPPOSITION AND REPLY BRIEFS ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT filed by Richard E. Korb. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on December 4, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2014)
August 13, 2012 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 10/18/2012. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/25/2012 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 8/13/12. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2012)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Korb v. Commissioner of Social Security et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration Operations Center
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard E. Korb
Represented By: Richard Elliot Korb
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]