Internet Patents Corporation v. Active Network, Inc.

Plaintiff: Internet Patents Corporation
Defendant: Active Network, Inc.
 
Case Number: 4:2012cv05035
Filed: September 27, 2012
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Donna M. Ryu
 
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
February 6, 2013 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 25 STIPULATION to Continue Case Management Conference. Case Management Statement due by 4/5/2013. Case Management Conference set for 4/12/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 2/6/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2013)
June 26, 2013 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING AS MODIFIED: (34 in 3:12-cv-06505-JSW) STIPULATION to Extend Response and Reply re (33) MOTION to Dismiss. Motion Hearing (in 3:12-cv-6505; 3:12-cv-6506; 3:12-cv-5036) set for 10/4/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 6/26/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2013)
September 24, 2013 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on September 24, 2013. (jswlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2013)
October 25, 2013 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 1025/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Internet Patents Corporation v. Active Network, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Internet Patents Corporation
Represented By: Michael Pierre Adams
Represented By: Brian Lawrence King
Represented By: L. Eric Loewe
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Active Network, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]