Logan v. Astrue

Plaintiff: Charles William Logan
Defendant: Michael J Astrue
 
Case Number: 4:2012cv05908
Filed: November 19, 2012
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Saundra Brown Armstrong
 
Nature of Suit: Social Security: RSI Tax Suits
Cause of Action: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
May 15, 2013 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO DEFENDANT TO SHOW CAUSE (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 5/15/2013)
September 3, 2013 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO PLAINTIFF TO SHOW CAUSE (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 9/3/2013)
September 24, 2013 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 9/24/2013)
September 24, 2013 23 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 9/24/2013)
January 10, 2013 4 Opinion or Order of the Court Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases re C-04-2661-SI. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 01/10/13. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Logan v. Astrue
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles William Logan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J Astrue
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]